EP2054816 - CAPTURING AND SHARING MEDIA CONTENT AND MANAGEMENT OF SHARED MEDIA CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sling Media L.L.C. Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, County of New Castle, Delaware 19801 / US | [2019/33] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Sling Media, Inc. 1051 East Hillsdale Blvd., Suite 500 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIKORIAN, Jason 1051 East Hillsdale Blvd., Suite 500 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
KRIKORIAN, Blake 1051 East Hillsdale Blvd., Suite 500 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
MECKLER, Brian 474 Beloit Ave Kensington, CA 94708 / US | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2013/19] | Bebbington, Nicholas Paul Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2009/19] | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07814265.0 | 20.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007US76337 | Priority number, date | US20060823066P | 21.08.2006 Original published format: US 823066 P | US20070620711 | 07.01.2007 Original published format: US 620711 | US20070620707 | 07.01.2007 Original published format: US 620707 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008024723 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2054816 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,KR);
G11B27/031 (EP);
H04L65/40 (KR);
H04L65/4025 (EP);
H04L65/611 (EP);
H04L67/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG UND GEMEINSAME NUTZUNG VON MEDIENINHALTEN SOWIE VERWALTUNG GEMEINSAM GENUTZTER MEDIENINHALTE | [2009/19] | English: | CAPTURING AND SHARING MEDIA CONTENT AND MANAGEMENT OF SHARED MEDIA CONTENT | [2009/19] | French: | CAPTURE ET PARTAGE DE CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA, ET GESTION DU CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA PARTAGÉ | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 23.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.01.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/30] | 17.03.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/30] | Appeal following examination | 26.03.2019 | Appeal received No. T1804/19 | 25.05.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 17.06.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 17.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6476826 (PLOTKIN ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US2003208612 (HARRIS MICHAEL ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]US2006101499 (ARAVAMUDAN MURALI [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0013] *; | [I]US2006156219 (HAOT MAX [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] *; | [X]US2006184980 (COLE DAVID J [GB]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0134] * | International search | [Y]US2002031333 (MANO YOSHIZUMI [US], et al); | [Y]US6389467 (EYAL AVIV [US]); | [Y]US2002105529 (BOWSER JASON [US], et al); | [X]US6476826 (PLOTKIN ROBERT C [US], et al); | [Y]US2005053356 (MATE ELENA [CA], et al); | [YP]US2007074115 (PATTEN MICHAEL J [US], et al) | Examination | US2003200313 | US2005021539 | US2005022019 |