EP2053982 - ULTRASONIC TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/19] | ULTRASONIC TREATMENT OF GLUCOMA | ||
[2009/41] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schwartz, Donald N. 2650 Elm Avenue No. 108 Long Beach, CA 90806 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Schwartz, Donald N 2650 Elm Avenue 108 Long Beach CA 90806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2009/19] | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street GB-Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07814316.1 | 21.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007US76448 | Priority number, date | US20060839473P | 22.08.2006 Original published format: US 839473 P | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008024795 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2053982 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/00, A61B19/00, A61B17/22 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
A61N7/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61F9/00781 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLBEHANDLUNG EINES GLAUKOMS | [2009/19] | English: | ULTRASONIC TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA | [2009/41] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE GLAUCOME PAR ULTRASONS | [2009/19] |
Former [2009/19] | ULTRASONIC TREATMENT OF GLUCOMA | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2631545 (BIODOMI [FR]) [Y] 4,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US6352519 (ANIS AZIZ Y [US], et al) [Y] 3,7* abstract *; | [XY]US2002111608 (BAERVELDT GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0113] * [Y] 3-5,7 | International search | [Y]US5458130 (KAUFMAN JONATHAN J [US], et al); | [X]US6162193 (EKBERG LARS [SE]); | [X]US2002111608 (BAERVELDT GEORGE [US], et al); | [Y]US2003088260 (SMEDLEY GREGORY T [US], et al) | Examination | WO9851284 | RU2165247 | WO02089699 | US6599256 | US2004091541 | WO2005030295 |