EP2061571 - MULTI-COMPONENT, SIMULTANEOUS, INDEPENDENT MULTI-GRADIENT SYSTEM FOR LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryobiophysica, Inc. 8909 Ellsworth Ct Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US | [2010/15] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Cryobiophysica, Inc. 12111 Parklawn Drive Rockville, MD 20852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRSH, Allen, G. CRYOBIOPHYSICA, INC. 12111 Parklawn Drive Rockville, Maryland 20852 / US | 02 /
TSONEV, Latchezar, I. CRYOBIOPHYSICA, INC. 12111 Parklawn Drive Rockville, Maryland 20852 / US | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07814561.2 | 29.08.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007US77162 | Priority number, date | US20060840688P | 29.08.2006 Original published format: US 840688 P | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008028001 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2061571 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/08, G01N30/96, // G01N30/34 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B03C5/00 (EP,US);
B03C5/02 (EP,US);
G01N30/34 (EP,US);
G01N30/96 (EP,US);
G01N2030/8831 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | B01D15/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRKOMPONENTIGES, SIMULTANES, UNABHÄNGIGES MULTIGRADIENTENSYSTEM FÜR DIE FLÜSSIGKEITSCHROMATOGRAPHIE | [2009/22] | English: | MULTI-COMPONENT, SIMULTANEOUS, INDEPENDENT MULTI-GRADIENT SYSTEM FOR LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY | [2009/22] | French: | SYSTÈME MULTI-GRADIENT INDÉPENDANT, SIMULTANÉ, MULTI-COMPOSANT, POUR LA CHROMATOGRAPHIE LIQUIDE | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 05.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/27] | 29.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2010 | 31.08.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2011 | 31.08.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.02.2012 | 31.08.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0146687 (TRANSGENOMIC INC [US]) [Y] 1 * page 9, line 18 - page 3, line 3; figure 2 * * page 39, line 4 - page 41, line 4 * * figure 28 *; | [Y]WO2004103519 (DNAVAX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 1 * * page 33, line 32 - page 34, line 4 * * page 34, lines 22-30 * * page 49, lines 4-19 * * figure 6 *; | [Y]WO9913328 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y] - SHAN L ET AL, "Gradient chromatofocusing. Versatile pH gradient separation of proteins in ion-exchange HPLC: characterization studies", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20021101), vol. 74, no. 21, doi:10.1021/AC020169Q, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 5641 - 5649, XP003011879 [Y] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac020169q | [A] - A.B. TESSMAN, A.V. IVANOV, "Computer Calculations of Acid-Base Equilibria in Aqueous Solutions Using the Acid-Base Calculator Program", JOURNAL OF ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, Nauka, Moscow, (2002), vol. 57, no. 1, pages 2 - 7, XP002673783 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1013672004064 | International search | [A]US2007144973 (TSONEV LATCHEZAR I [US], et al); | [A]US6221250 (STAFSTROEM NILS [SE]) |