EP2089531 - BIOSENSOR SYSTEM HAVING ENHANCED STABILITY AND HEMATOCRIT PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ascensia Diabetes Care Holdings AG Peter-Merian Strasse 90 4052 Basel / CH | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard Whippany, NJ 07981-0915 / US | ||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare, LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Huan-Ping 14374 Shoreline Dr. Granger, IN 46530 / US | 02 /
NELSON, Christine, D. 68972 Lake Street Edwardsburg, Michigan 49112 / US | 03 /
SPRADLIN, Hope 10232 Ashley's Meadow Dr. Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | 04 /
MAURER, Eric 5633 Osage Lake Dr. Apt. 3B Mishawaka, Indiana 46545 / US | [2019/28] |
Former [2009/34] | 01 /
WU, Huan-Ping 14374 Shoreline Dr. Granger, IN 46530 / US | ||
02 /
NELSON, Christine, D. 68972 Lake Street Edwardsburg, Michigan 49112 / US | |||
03 /
SPRADLIN, Hope 10232 Ashley's Meadow Dr. Grainger, Indiana 46530 / US | |||
04 /
MAURER, Eric 5633 Osage Lake Dr. Apt. 3B Mishawaka, Indiana 46545 / US | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Gille Hrabal Postfach 18 04 09 40571 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | BIP Patents Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH IPO-P-MON Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | Linhart, Angela Bayer HealthCare AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing Building Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07814768.3 | 09.09.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007US77955 | Priority number, date | US20060846688P | 22.09.2006 Original published format: US 846688 P | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008036516 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089531 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089531 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, G01N33/49, C12Q1/00, G01N33/543 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
G01N27/3272 (EP,US);
G01N27/3274 (US);
C12Q1/004 (EP,US);
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
G01N27/327 (EP,US);
G01N27/3273 (US);
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | C12Q1/00, G01N27/30, G01N33/487 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/28] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BIOSENSORSYSTEM MIT VERBESSERTER STABILITÄT UND HÄMATOKRIT-AUSFÜHRUNG | [2009/34] | English: | BIOSENSOR SYSTEM HAVING ENHANCED STABILITY AND HEMATOCRIT PERFORMANCE | [2009/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BIOCAPTEUR PRÉSENTANT UNE STABILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE ET UNE FONCTION DE MESURE D'HÉMATOCRITE | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 18.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2018 | 21.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19173431.8 / EP3543348 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2007 | AT | 10.07.2019 | CY | 10.07.2019 | CZ | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | EE | 10.07.2019 | FI | 10.07.2019 | LT | 10.07.2019 | LV | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | MT | 10.07.2019 | NL | 10.07.2019 | PL | 10.07.2019 | RO | 10.07.2019 | SE | 10.07.2019 | SI | 10.07.2019 | SK | 10.07.2019 | TR | 10.07.2019 | IE | 09.09.2019 | LU | 09.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | BG | 10.10.2019 | GR | 11.10.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | PT | 11.11.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.09.2007 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.09.2019 | ||
LU | 09.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.09.2019 | ||
LU | 09.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.09.2019 | ||
LU | 09.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 09.09.2019 | ||
LU | 09.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 09.09.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 10.07.2019 | |
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 10.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1074832 (BAYER AG [US]) [X] 1-16,20-25 * column 3, line 49 - line 53; figure 3 * [Y] 17-19; | [YX]WO2006042304 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US], et al) [Y] 17-19 * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0132] * [X] 26-43,47-50; | [A]WO2006096619 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * the whole document *; | [X]US6413398 (GERHARDT GEOFF CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 26-40,43,47-50 * column 5, line 14 - line 52; figure 3 * | Examination | US6120676 | US2005016844 |