EP2066266 - POSTERIOR STABILIZED KNEE PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New York Society for the Ruptured and Crippled Maintaining the Hospital for Special Surgery 535 East 70th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPMAN, Joseph 165 W 91 St. 7G New York NY 10024 / US | 02 /
RABINOWICZ, Anna 107 West 25th, Apt. 2E New York NY 10001 / US | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2012/27] | Olsen, Lars Pallisgaard Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2009/24] | Olsen, Lars Pallisgaard Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 07814989.5 | 25.09.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007US79355 | Priority number, date | US20060826844P | 25.09.2006 Original published format: US 826844 P | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008039735 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2066266 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2066266 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
A61F2/3886 (EP,US);
A61F2/3836 (US);
A61F2/3859 (EP,US);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30301 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Extension states | AL | 03.04.2009 | BA | 03.04.2009 | HR | 03.04.2009 | MK | 03.04.2009 | RS | 03.04.2009 | Title | German: | POSTERIORE STABILISIERTE KNIEPROTHESE | [2009/24] | English: | POSTERIOR STABILIZED KNEE PROSTHESIS | [2009/24] | French: | PROTHÈSE DE GENOU STABILISÉE POSTÉRIEURE | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 16.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11178587.9 / EP2404575 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2007 | AT | 04.07.2012 | BE | 04.07.2012 | CY | 04.07.2012 | CZ | 04.07.2012 | DK | 04.07.2012 | EE | 04.07.2012 | FI | 04.07.2012 | LT | 04.07.2012 | LV | 04.07.2012 | MT | 04.07.2012 | NL | 04.07.2012 | PL | 04.07.2012 | RO | 04.07.2012 | SE | 04.07.2012 | SI | 04.07.2012 | SK | 04.07.2012 | TR | 04.07.2012 | LU | 25.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 04.10.2012 | GR | 05.10.2012 | IS | 04.11.2012 | PT | 05.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
LU | 25.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
TR | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
MT | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 04.10.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
RO | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
SK | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
EE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
DK | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
NL | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
PT | 05.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SE | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
LV | 04.07.2012 | ||
PL | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.10.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
CY | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
FI | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
BE | 04.07.2012 | ||
LT | 04.07.2012 | ||
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.07.2012 | |
SI | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | SI | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3840905 (DEANE G) [X] 1,2,4,8,13,14 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 25 * * figures 1-8 *; | [X]US4064568 (GRUNDEI HANS, et al) [X] 1,4,8,14 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 3 * * figures 3,5,7,8 *; | [X]FR2709662 (MEDINOV SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 1 ** figure - *; | [X]WO2005072657 (MASSACHUSETTS GEN HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,13,14 * page 15, line 24 - page 17, line 2 * * page 17, line 28 - page 18, line 19 * * figures 1-3,13,17-21 * | International search | [X]US4213209 (INSALL JOHN N [US], et al); | [A]US5358527 (FORTE MARK R [US]); | [A]US2003004577 (RUNNING DONALD E [US]); | [A]US7081137 (SERVIDIO DAMON J [US]) |