EP2026653 - ADMINISTRATION OF THE REG1 ANTICOAGULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regado Biosciences, Inc. 318 Blackwell Street,Suite 130 Durham, NC 27701 / US | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUSCONI, Christopher, P. 324 Blackwell Street, Suite 420 Durham, NC 27701 / US | 02 /
TONKENS, Ross, M. 120 Hamilton Hedge Place Cary, NC 27519 / US | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07815043.0 | 25.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007US12625 | Priority number, date | US20060808987P | 26.05.2006 Original published format: US 808987 P | US20060847809P | 27.09.2006 Original published format: US 847809 P | US20060865352P | 10.11.2006 Original published format: US 865352 P | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007140000 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2026653 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7088, A61P7/02 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61K49/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/09] | A01N43/04, A61K31/70, C12N15/00, A61K38/00, A61K31/715 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG EINES REG1-ANTIKOAGULIERUNGSSYSTEMS | [2009/09] | English: | ADMINISTRATION OF THE REG1 ANTICOAGULATION SYSTEM | [2009/09] | French: | ADMINISTRATION DU SYSTÈME D'ANTICOAGULATION REG1 | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 02.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO2005106042 (REGADO BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) [XD] 7-19 * abstract * * p.55, In vivo activity of Apt39 and Apt7AD in cynomolgus Monkeys - p. 58 * [Y] 1-6; | [YP] - OMORI HISAKO ET AL, "Requiring lower warfarin dosages to achieve therapeutic anticoagulation is a strong risk factor for bleeding event", CIRCULATION, vol. 114, no. 18, Suppl. S, (20061031), 79TH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC SESSION OF THE AMERICAN-HEART-ASSOCIATION; CHICAGO, IL, USA; NOVEMBER 12 -15, 2006, URL: http://circ.ahajournals.org/cgi/content/meeting_abstract/114/18_MeetingAbstracts/II_478-a, (20110926), XP002659967 [YP] 1-6 * abstract * | [YP] - CORDULA MEYER ZU SCHWABEDISSEN ET AL, "Obesity is associated with a slower response to initial phenprocoumon therapy whereas CYP2C9 genotypes are not", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060718), vol. 62, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S00228-006-0158-3, ISSN 1432-1041, pages 713 - 720, XP019421066 [YP] 1-6 * abstract * * p. 714, Independent variables * * p. 717, Obesity and phenprocoumon sensivity * * p. 719, col. 2, §1 *;; figure 1; table 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00228-006-0158-3 | International search | [X]US2003083294 (SULLENGER BRUCE A [US], et al); | [XP] - DYKE C.K. ET AL., "First-in-human experience of an antidote-controlled anticoagulant using RNA aptamer technology: a phase la pharmacodynamic evaluation of a drug-antidote pair for the controlled regulation of factor IXa activity", CIRCULATION, (20061205), vol. 114, no. 23, pages 2490 - 2497, XP008102217 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.106.668434 | [A] - DROLET D.W. ET AL., "Pharmacokinetics and safety of an anti-vascular endothelial growth factor aptamer (NX1838) following injection into the vitreous humaor of rhesus monkeys", MEDLINE, (200012), Database accession no. (11303960), XP008100856 | [ ] - PHARMA RES., vol. 17, no. 12, pages 1503 - 1510 | [Y] - RUSCONI C.P. ET AL., "RNA aptamers as reversible antagonists of coagulation factor IXa", NATURE, (20020905), vol. 419, no. 6902, pages 90 - 94, XP002956811 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature00963 | [A] - GOPINATH S.C. ET AL., "A potent anti-coagulant RNA aptamer inhibits blood coagulation by specifically blocking the extrinsic clotting pathway", THROMB HAEMOST., (200605), vol. 95, no. 5, pages 767 - 771, XP008103393 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1160/TH06-01-0047 | [X] - RUSCONI C.P. ET AL., "Antidote-mediated control of an antocoagulant aptamer in vivo", NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (200411), vol. 22, no. 11, pages 1423 - 1428, XP008064496 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1023 | [A] - BOOMER R.M. ET AL., "Conjugation to polyethylene glycol polymer promotes aptamer biodistribution to healthy and inflamed tissues.", MEDLINE, (2005), Database accession no. (16201906), XP008100857 | [ ] - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES, vol. 15, no. 3, pages 183 - 195 |