EP2208359 - POSITION DETERMINATION OF SOUND SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AKG Acoustics GmbH Lemböckgasse 21 - 25 1230 Wien / AT | [2010/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINING, Friedrich Fesstgasse 10/22 A-1160 Vienna / AT | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner Operngasse 4 P.O. Box 96 1010 Wien / AT | [2016/04] |
Former [2010/29] | Patentanwälte Barger, Piso & Partner Mahlerstrasse 9 Postfach 96 1015 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07815178.4 | 13.11.2007 | [2010/29] | WO2007AT00511 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009062211 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2208359 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2208359 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/38, H04R1/40 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
H04R1/38 (EP,US);
H04R1/406 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2010/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POSITIONSBESTIMMUNG VON SCHALLQUELLEN | [2010/29] | English: | POSITION DETERMINATION OF SOUND SOURCES | [2010/29] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE POSITION DE SOURCES SONORES | [2010/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 20.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2007 | BE | 27.01.2016 | CY | 27.01.2016 | CZ | 27.01.2016 | DK | 27.01.2016 | EE | 27.01.2016 | ES | 27.01.2016 | FI | 27.01.2016 | IT | 27.01.2016 | LT | 27.01.2016 | LV | 27.01.2016 | MC | 27.01.2016 | NL | 27.01.2016 | PL | 27.01.2016 | RO | 27.01.2016 | SE | 27.01.2016 | SI | 27.01.2016 | SK | 27.01.2016 | TR | 27.01.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.04.2016 | IS | 27.05.2016 | PT | 27.05.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.11.2007 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | BE | 27.01.2016 | |
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 27.01.2016 | |
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 27.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP1737268 (AKG ACOUSTICS GMBH [AT]) [DA] 1-18 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph L * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2007009115 (REINING FRIEDRICH [AT], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 1, column L, paragraph 7 - page 2, column L, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1737271 (AKG ACOUSTICS GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-18 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-5 * | [A] - MALHAM D, "The role of the single point soundfield microphone in surround sound systems", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://pddocserv/specdocs/data/handbooks/AES/UK-Cnf-Proc/1998LO03/1667.p, (20051116), XP002354291 [A] 1-18 * page 53, column 2 - page 57 * |