EP2097115 - USE OF TROPOELASTIN FOR REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elastagen Pty Ltd National Innovation Centre 4 Cornwallis Street Eveleigh New South Wales 2015 / AU | [2016/08] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states The University of Sydney Level 5, SIT Building (J12) The University of Sydney Sydney, NSW 2006 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Anthony Steven The University of Sydney Level 5 SIT Building (J12) New South Wales 2006 / AU | 02 /
MITHIEUX, Suzanne Marie The University of Sydney Level 5 SIT Building (J12) New South Wales 2006 / AU | [2016/08] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
WEISS, Anthony Steven The University of Sydney Level 5 SIT Building (J12) New South Wales 2006 / AU | ||
02 /
MITHIEUX, Suzanne Marie The University of Sydney Level 5 SIT Building (J12) New South Wales 2006 / AU | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2009/37] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07815541.3 | 13.11.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007AU01738 | Priority number, date | AU2006906319P | 13.11.2006 Original published format: AU 2006906319 P | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008058323 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2097115 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2097115 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/04, A61L27/22, A61K8/64, A61Q19/08 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
A61L27/227 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61L31/047 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/86 (EP,US);
A61K2800/91 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/41] | A61L27/22, A61K8/64, A61Q19/08 | ||
Former IPC [2009/37] | A61L26/00, A61L27/22, A61Q99/00, A61K8/64, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON TROPOELASTIN ZUR REPARATUR ODER WIEDERHERSTELLUNG VON GEWEBE | [2009/37] | English: | USE OF TROPOELASTIN FOR REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF TISSUE | [2009/37] | French: | UTILISATION DE TROPOÉLASTINE POUR RÉPARER OU RESTAURER UN TISSU | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 26.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2007 | AT | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | DK | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | ES | 25.01.2017 | FI | 25.01.2017 | IT | 25.01.2017 | LT | 25.01.2017 | LV | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | NL | 25.01.2017 | PL | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | SE | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | TR | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | IS | 25.05.2017 | PT | 25.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.11.2007 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.11.2007 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9834563 (SISTERS OF PROVIDENCE IN OREGO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,11-15 * pages 22-23; claim - *; | [XI] - VRHOVSKI B ET AL, "Coacervation characteristics of recombinant human tropoelastin", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, BERLIN, DE, (19971101), vol. 250, no. 1, doi:10.1111/J.1432-1033.1997.00092.X, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 92 - 98, XP008109628 [X] 1,2,4-13 * Experimental Procedures; Results * [I] 3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1997.00092.x | International search | [X] - VRHOVSKI B. ET AL., "Coacervation characteristics of recombinant human tropoelastin", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (19971101), vol. 250, no. 1, pages 92 - 98, XP008109628 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1997.00092.x | [Y] - "Characteristics of Elastin Peptides in Coacervate States: pH Effect and Possible Ion Transport Mechanism", OKAMOTO K. ET AL., Peptide Chemistry, (1989), vol. 27TH ED., pages 369 - 374, XP008110287 | [A] - LIN S. ET AL., "pH- and Thermal-Dependent Conformational Transition of PGAIPG, a Repeated Hexapeptide Sequence From Tropoelastin", PEPTIDES, (2005), vol. 26, pages 543 - 549, XP025378529 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.peptides.2004.11.005 |