EP2064311 - HIGH-THROUGHPUT AUTOMATED CELLULAR INJECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun, Yu Apt. 2607,909 Bay Street Toronto, Ontario M5S 3G2 / CA | For all designated states Wang, Wenhui 909 Bay Street, Suite 2607 Toronto, Ontario M5S 3G2 / CA | For all designated states Liu, Xinyu 30 Charles Street, West, Suite 1620 Toronto, Ontario M4Y 1R5 / CA | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | McCartney, Jonathan William, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2013/46] |
Former [2009/23] | Forrester, Simon Joseph, et al Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street GB-Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07815875.5 | 21.09.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007CA01685 | Priority number, date | CA20062560352 | 21.09.2006 Original published format: CA 2560352 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008034249 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064311 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 27.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/00, B01L3/02, C12M1/00, C12N15/89, G01N35/10 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
C12M23/50 (EP,US);
C12M35/00 (EP,US);
C12M41/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2009/23] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES ZELLINJEKTIONSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ | [2009/23] | English: | HIGH-THROUGHPUT AUTOMATED CELLULAR INJECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2009/23] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INJECTION CELLULAIRE AUTOMATISÉE À HAUT RENDEMENT | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 17.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/36] | 29.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005254046 (MATSUOKA HIDEAKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6-9,12-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0015] , [0016] , [0018] , [0020] , [0031] , [0032] , [0033] , [0051] , [0052] , [0054] , [0066] * * figures 1,6,8 * [Y] 1,2,4,5,10,14,21-26; | [Y]EP1595941 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,10,14,21-26 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0019] , [0021] , [0026] , [0029] , [0040] , [0046] , [0047] , [0077] * * figures 2A,3,5,11A *; | [A]EP1182250 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0027] , [0048] , [0049] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002116732 (CHRISTMANN LEANDRO [US]) [A] 1,21 * paragraphs [0002] , [0017] - [0020] * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1683855 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,21 * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] *; | [A]CA2437238 (AVIGENICS INC [US]) [A] 1,9,21,24 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 11 * * page 12, line 21 - page 14, line 24 * | [XP] - WANG W ET AL, "A fully automated robotic system for microinjection of zebrafish embryos", PLOS ONE, PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, US, (20070912), vol. 2, no. 9, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0000862, ISSN 1932-6203, pages E862 - 1, XP008105113 [XP] 1-14,21-26 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 3, paragraphs 1,3 * * page 4, paragraphs 2,3 * * figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0000862 | [YD] - SUN Y ET AL, "Biological Cell Injection Using an Autonomous MicroRobotic System", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ROBOTICS RESEARCH, SAGE SCIENCE PRESS, THOUSAND OAKS, US, (20021031), vol. 21, no. 10-11, doi:10.1177/0278364902021010833, ISSN 0278-3649, pages 861 - 868, XP008105112 [YD] 1,2,4,5,10,14,21-26 * page 861, column 2, paragraphs 3-4 * * page 863, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 863, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0278364902021010833 | [A] - KOBAYASHI K ET AL, "Subzonal insemination of a single mouse spermatozoon with a personal computer-controlled micromanipulation system", MOLECULAR REPRODUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT, WILEY-LISS, INC, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.1002/MRD.1080330112, ISSN 1040-452X, (19920930), pages 81 - 88, (20050204), XP008105116 [A] 1,21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrd.1080330112 | [A] - SAKAI S ET AL, "Automated high-throughput microinjection system for floating cells", IMAGING, MANIPULATION, AND ANALYSIS OF BIOMOLECULES AND CELLS: FUNDAMENTALS AND APPLICATIONS III : 24 - 27 JANUARY 2005, SAN JOSE, CALIFORNIA, USA, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WASH, vol. 5699, doi:10.1117/12.590014, ISBN 978-0-8194-5673-1, (20050331), pages 59 - 66, (20050411), XP008105114 [A] 1,21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.590014 | International search | [X]EP1595941 ; | [XP]EP1762608 ; | [X]EP1683855 ; | [X]US2002106715 ; | [XP]JP2007222132 ; | [A]CA2437238 ; | [Y] - SUN Y. AND NELSON B.J., "Biological injection using an autonomous microrobotic system", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ROBOTICS RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 21, pages 861 - 868, XP008105112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0278364902021010833 | [XP] - WANG W. ET AL., "A fully automated robotic system for microinjection of zebrafish embryos", PLOS ONE, vol. 2, no. 9, (20070912), URL: http://www.plosone.org/article/info%3Adoi%2F10.1371%Fjournal.pone.0000862, XP008105113 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0000862 | [X] - NICOLAU D. ET AL., "Automated high-throughput microinjection system for floating cells", IMAGING, MANIPULATION AND ANALYSIS OF BIOMOLECULES AND CELLS: FUNDAMENTALS AND APPLICATIONS III. PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING - PROCEDDINGS OF SPIE, (2005), vol. 5699, pages 59 - 66, XP008105114 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.590014 | [A] - PARK J. ET AL., "Design and fabrication of an integrated cell processor for single embryo cell manipulation", LAB CHIP, (2005), vol. 5, pages 91 - 96, XP008105115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B404990J | [A] - KOBAYASHI K. ET AL., "Subzonal insemination of a single mouse spermatozoom with a personal computer controlled micromanipulation system", MOLECULAR REPRODUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT, (1992), vol. 33, pages 81 - 88, XP008105116 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrd.1080330112 |