EP2089061 - INHIBITION OF SOX9 FUNCTION IN THE TREATMENT OF PROTEOGLYCAN-ASSOCIATED PATHOPHYSIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/34] | INHIBITION OF SOX9 FUNCTION FN THE TREATMENT OF PROTEOGL YCAN-ASSOCIATED PATHOPHYSIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS | ||
[2015/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Of Western Ontario Gordon Mogenson Building 100 Collip Circle Suite 105 London, ON N6G 4X8 / CA | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Arthur 30 Dana Crescent Thornhill, ON L4J 2R5 / CA | 02 /
GRIS, Paul 3674A Manns Chapel Road Chapel Hill NC 27516 / US | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/39] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2009/34] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 07816052.0 | 25.10.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007CA01902 | Priority number, date | US20060863202P | 27.10.2006 Original published format: US 863202 P | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008049226 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089061 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089061 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/711, C07K16/28, G01N33/68, A61K48/00, A61K39/395, A61P25/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/68, C07H21/00, C12N15/12, C12N15/113, A61K39/00 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
C07K16/2845 (EP,US);
A61K31/711 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
G01N33/6887 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
G01N2500/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/37] | A61K31/711, C07K16/28, G01N33/68, A61K48/00, A61K39/395, A61P25/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/68, C07H21/00, C12N15/12 | ||
Former IPC [2009/34] | A61K48/00, A61K31/711, A61K39/395, A61P25/00, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/68, C07H21/00, C12N15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HEMMUNG DER SOX9-FUNKTION BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON PATHOPHYSIOLOGISCHEN ZUSTÄNDEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT PROTEOGLYKAN | [2009/34] | English: | INHIBITION OF SOX9 FUNCTION IN THE TREATMENT OF PROTEOGLYCAN-ASSOCIATED PATHOPHYSIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS | [2015/15] | French: | INHIBITION DE LA FONCTION SOX9 DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'ÉTATS PATHOPHYSIOLOGIQUES ASSOCIÉS À UN PROTÉOGLYCANE | [2009/34] |
Former [2009/34] | INHIBITION OF SOX9 FUNCTION FN THE TREATMENT OF PROTEOGL YCAN-ASSOCIATED PATHOPHYSIOLOGICAL CONDITIONS | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 16.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 20.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2007 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BE | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | ES | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | IT | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MT | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | IE | 25.10.2015 | LU | 25.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | GB | 02.12.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | DE | 03.05.2016 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.10.2007 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
GB | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
BE | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
GB | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
GB | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 25.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
DE | 03.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005100552 (SANBIO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10 * the whole document * [I] 4-6; | [IP] - GRIS PAUL ET AL, "Transcriptional regulation of scar gene expression in primary astrocytes.", GLIA 15 AUG 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17597120, (20070815), vol. 55, no. 11, ISSN 0894-1491, pages 1145 - 1155, XP002595336 [IP] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/GLIA.20537 | [A] - WEGNER ET AL, "From stem cells to neurons and glia: a Soxist's view of neural development", TRENDS IN NEUROSCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.TINS.2005.08.008, (20051101), vol. 28, no. 11, ISSN 0166-2236, pages 583 - 588, XP005123801 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tins.2005.08.008 | [A] - GRIS D ET AL, "TRANSIENT BLOCKADE OF THE CD11D/CD18 INTEGRIN REDUCES SECONDARY DAMAGE AFTER SPINAL CORD INJURY, IMPROVING SENSORY, AUTONOMIC, AND MOTOR FUNCTION", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.5343-03.2004, (20040421), vol. 24, no. 16, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 4043 - 4051, XP009046075 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.5343-03.2004 | [A] - STOLT C CLAUS ET AL, "The Sox9 transcription factor determines glial fate choice in the developing spinal cord.", GENES & DEVELOPMENT 1 JUL 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12842915, (20030701), vol. 17, no. 13, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 1677 - 1689, XP002595337 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/GAD.259003 | [A] - SAVILLE L R ET AL, "A monoclonal antibody to CD11d reduces the inflammatory infiltrate into the injured spinal cord: a potential neuroprotective treatment", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, XX LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.JNEUROIM.2004.07.002, (20041101), vol. 156, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 42 - 57, XP004591400 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jneuroim.2004.07.002 | International search | [X]WO03102130 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al); | [XP] - GRIS P. ET AL., "Transcriptional Regulation Of Scar Gene Expression In Primary Astrocytes", GLIA, (20070815), vol. 55, pages 1145 - 1155, XP008109655 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/glia.20537 | [AP] - SUMI E. ET AL., "SRY-Related HMG Box 9 Regulates The Expression Of Col4a2 Through Transactivating Its Enhancer Element In Mesangial Cells", AM. J. PATHOL., (200706), vol. 170, pages 1854 - 1864, XP008109656 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2353/ajpath.2007.060899 | by applicant | US5034506 | - P.E. NIELSON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, page 1497 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - YAMAUCHI S; MITA S; MATSUBARA T; FUKUTA M; HABUCHI H; KIMATA K; HABUCHI O, "Molecular cloning and expression of chondroitin 4-sulfotransferase", J BIOL CHEM, (2000), vol. 275, no. 12, pages 8975 - 81 | - ZUO J; NEUBAUER D; DYESS K; FERGUSON TA; MUIR D, "Degradation of chondroitin sulfate proteoglycan enhances the neurite- promoting potential of spinal cord tissue", EXP NEUROL, (1998), vol. 154, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1006/exnr.1998.6951, pages 654 - 62, XP003008298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exnr.1998.6951 | - FOK-SEANG, J.; L. C. SMITH-THOMAS ET AL., "An analysis of astrocytic cell lines with different abilities to promote axon growth", BRAIN RES, (1995), vol. 689, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-8993(95)00575-B, pages 207 - 23, XP022256998 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-8993(95)00575-B | - GRIS, P.; A. TIGHE ET AL., "Transcriptional regulation of scar gene expression in primary astrocytes", GLIA, (2007), vol. 55, no. 11, pages 1145 - 55 | - WESTON, A. D.; R. A. S. CHANDRARATNA ET AL., "Requirement for RAR- mediated gene repression in skeletal progenitor differentiation", J. CELL BIOL., (2002), vol. 158, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.200112029, pages 39 - 51, XP002244028 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.200112029 |