EP2091040 - DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/34] | A DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE | ||
[2010/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Jianfeng Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang Distrcit Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
XU, Lijing Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Qing Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LI, Wei Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
SANG, Shenghu Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
DU, Zhengzhong Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07817361.4 | 04.12.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007CN71171 | Priority number, date | CN20061162678 | 04.12.2006 Original published format: CN200610162678 | [2009/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008067763 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091040 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2091040 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
G10L19/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | G10L19/00, H04L1/00, H03M13/00, H04B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | DEKODIERVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2010/03] | English: | DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2010/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE | [2009/34] |
Former [2009/34] | DEKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2009/34] | A DECODING METHOD AND DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2009 | Translation filed | 22.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 22.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | LT | 28.04.2010 | LV | 28.04.2010 | MT | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | IS | 28.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | HU | 29.10.2010 | IE | 04.12.2010 | LU | 04.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
LU | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
LU | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6408267 (PROUST STEPHANE [FR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 16 * | International search | [Y]CN1134581 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]CN1168751 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]); | [Y]US5862518 (NOMURA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]CN1489762 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [Y]CN1535461 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [Y]US6810377 (HO GRANT IAN [CA], et al) |