EP2076381 - STAND-UP POUCH CONSISTING OF A MULTI-LAYERED FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3A Technology & Management AG Badischer Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2010/23] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEVILACQUA, Markus Hasenbergstrasse 5 8213 Neunkirch / CH | 02 /
JACOBSEN, Sven Quintusstrasse 22 29683 Bad Fallingbostel / DE | [2009/28] | Application number, filing date | 07818452.0 | 26.09.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007EP08368 | Priority number, date | EP20060405410 | 28.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06405410 | [2009/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008037447 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2076381 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/08, B32B15/08, B29C55/28 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
B32B27/00 (EP);
B29C55/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STANDBEUTEL AUS EINEM MEHRSCHICHTIGEN FILM | [2009/28] | English: | STAND-UP POUCH CONSISTING OF A MULTI-LAYERED FILM | [2009/28] | French: | SACHET À FOND PLAT CONSTITUÉ D'UNE FEUILLE MULTICOUCHE | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2010 | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/05] | 24.09.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/05] | 19.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1410902 (TECNO COATING ENGINEERING S R [IT]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0079] * * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2004080805 (PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EU [FR]; BUELOW DUANE H [US]; DOUGLAS MICH) [Y] 1,7 * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 19 * * page 16, lines 16,17 * * example - *; | [Y]WO0103922 (TECNO COATING ENGINEERING S R [IT]; ZANELLA MARCO [IT]; GINI ALESSANDR) [Y] 1 * page 2, lines 5-20 *; | [Y]WO2004110755 (TECNO COATING ENGINEERING S R [IT]; GINI CLAUDIO [IT]) [Y] 1 * page 8, lines 14-21; claims 1,6 *; | [Y]DE3803678 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1,7 * claim 1 *; | [Y]DE20002881U (LEER PACKAGING DEUTSCHLAND GMB [DE]) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE3805054 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * figure -; claims 1,9 * |