EP2095656 - Method and measuring system for measuring and testing a mobile radio terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/36] | METHOD AND MEASURING SYSTEM FOR MEASURING AND TESTING A MOBILE RADIO TERMINAL | ||
[2012/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHL, Andreas Mutschellestrasse 5 81673 München / DE | 02 /
SCHUMACHER, Adrian Regerstrasse 16 81541 München / DE | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
MICHL, Andreas Mutschellestrasse 4 81673 München / DE | ||
02 /
SCHUMACHER, Adrian Regerstrasse 16 81541 München / DE | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07818521.2 | 27.09.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007EP08438 | Priority number, date | DE20061050872 | 27.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006050872 | [2009/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008049498 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2095656 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2095656 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/00 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04B17/00 (KR);
H04W24/04 (US);
H04W24/06 (KR);
H04W28/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/36] | H04Q7/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Messsystem zum Messen und Testen eines Mobilfunk-Endgeräts | [2012/24] | English: | Method and measuring system for measuring and testing a mobile radio terminal | [2012/24] | French: | Procédé et système de mesure pour mesurer et tester un terminal de téléphonie mobile | [2012/24] |
Former [2009/36] | VERFAHREN UND MESSSYSTEM ZUM MESSEN UND TESTEN EINES MOBILFUNK-ENDGERÄTS | ||
Former [2009/36] | METHOD AND MEASURING SYSTEM FOR MEASURING AND TESTING A MOBILE RADIO TERMINAL | ||
Former [2009/36] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MESURE POUR MESURER ET TESTER UN TERMINAL DE TÉLÉPHONIE MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2007 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | PL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 27.09.2007 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
PL | 14.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1696682 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * page 2, line 37 - line 52 * * page 4, line 42 - line 49 * * paragraph [0023] * * figures 1,3A,3B,6A,6B *; | [X] - THE DEFENSE ADVANCED RESEARCH PROJECTS AGENCY (DARPA) NETWORKING IN EXTREME ENVIRONMENTS (NETEX) PROGRAM, "Test Master Plan for the NETEX program", INTERNET CITATION, (20020815), URL: http://www.mprg.org/people/buehrer/ultra/pdfs/DARPA%20NETEX%20TEST%20 PLAN.pdf, (20050624), XP002333378 [X] 1-20 * paragraph [7.1.3] * * figure 2 * * table 3 * | [X] - "Recommended Minimum Performance Standards for cdma2000 Spread Spectrum Base Stations", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT 2 3GPP2, XX, XX, (20050114), pages 1 - 152, URL: http://www.3gpp2.org/Public_html/specs/C.S0010-C_V1.0_050120.pdf, (20050623), XP002333380 [X] 1-20 * paragraph [3.7.1] - paragraph [3.72] * * paragraph [06.7] * * Abbildung 6.5.1-1 * | [A] - ROHDE & SCHWARZ GMBH & CO KG, "How to do Measurements according to TS 34.121 in presence of the HS-DPCCH with the R&S CMU200", INTERNET CITATION, (200511), pages 1 - 20, URL: http://www.rohde-schwarz.nl/www/dev_center.nsf/frameset?OpenAgent&web site=com&navig=/www/dev_center.nsf/html/nav,10,11&content=/appnote/1C M62.html, (20080206), XP007904016 [A] 1-20 * page 3, line 12 - line 17 * * page 16, line 21 - line 26 * * page 17, line 5 - line 7 * * figure 12 * |