EP2083657 - MECHANISM FOR AN OFFICE CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bock 1 GmbH & Co. KG An der Heide 17 92353 Postbauer-Heng / DE | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOCK, Hermann Jagdstrasse 8 90602 Pyrbaum / DE | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Andreas Oberer Markt 26 92318 Neumarkt i.d.OPf. / DE | [2009/32] | Application number, filing date | 07818987.5 | 12.10.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007EP08916 | Priority number, date | DE20061049040 | 13.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006049040 | DE20071022015 | 08.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007022015 | [2009/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008043574 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083657 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2083657 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/026, A47C1/032 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
A47C1/03255 (EP,US);
A47C1/03266 (EP,US);
A47C1/03272 (EP,US);
A47C1/03274 (EP,US);
A47C31/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | MECHANIK FÜR EINEN BÜROSTUHL | [2009/32] | English: | MECHANISM FOR AN OFFICE CHAIR | [2009/32] | French: | MÉCANISME POUR CHAISE DE BUREAU | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | IE | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | MT | 15.09.2010 | NL | 15.09.2010 | PL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | LU | 12.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | FR | 15.11.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | ES | 26.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/14] | BG | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
LU | 12.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 15.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BG | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 12.10.2010 | ||
LU | 12.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 15.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 12.10.2010 | ||
LU | 12.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 15.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 12.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 15.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 12.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 15.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 12.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 15.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 12.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 15.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 15.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 15.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4341071 (HANSEN FRITZ AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 36 * * column 4, lines 3-15 *; | [Y]DE4309439 (LINK WILHELM KG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 8; figure 3 *; | [Y]US3455601 (LIE FINN) [Y] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0638265 (GIRSBERGER HOLDING AG [CH]) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 1 * | by applicant | DE4341071 | DE4309439 | US3455601 | EP0638265 |