EP2109963 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR BUS ARBITRATION, CONVERTER AND MANUFACTURING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Strasse 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUA, Zhidong Georg-Friedrich-Str. 13 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
SIMON, Olaf Im Jüden 4 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 03 /
ZHOU, Wenwang Bauerweg 2 70435 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
MERTZLUFFT-PAUFLER Cornelius Reischstr. 5 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [2009/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/50] | Application number, filing date | 07819102.0 | 18.10.2007 | [2009/43] | WO2007EP09035 | Priority number, date | DE20061052297 | 03.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006052297 | [2009/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008052668 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2109963 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2109963 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/413, G06K19/07, H01F38/14, H04B5/00, G06F13/374 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
H04L12/4135 (EP,US);
H04L12/40143 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04W74/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BUSARBITRATION, UMRICHTER UND FERTIGUNGSANLAGE | [2009/43] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR BUS ARBITRATION, CONVERTER AND MANUFACTURING INSTALLATION | [2009/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ARBITRAGE ENTRE BUS, CONVERTISSEUR ET INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION | [2009/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12000773.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 07.02.2012 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2007 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | IT | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MC | 12.12.2012 | MT | 12.12.2012 | PL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | BG | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | ES | 23.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 18.10.2007 | |
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 12.12.2012 | |
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4451881 (GRICE DONALD G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,14,15,19-21,27 * the whole document *; | [A]US4626843 (SZETO KENNETH H [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2230166 (TAUB DANIEL MATTHEW) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3488445 | DE19635813 | DE4446779 | WO9217929 | GB2230166 | US4626843 | US2005225188 | WO2007010083 | US5422913 | US4451881 | DE10349242 | DE102006010900 | - G. SCHNELL, Systeme in der Automatisierungs- und Prozesstechnik, (200608), vol. 20, page 41 |