EP2098088 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINATION OF THE POSITION OF A TERMINAL IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GESSNER, Christina St.-Veit-Strasse 54 81673 München / DE | 02 /
PABST, Alexander Veilchenweg 37 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 03 /
MOHR, Karsten Martin-Luther-Strasse 8 81539 München / DE | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/08] | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | Mitscherlich, Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07819172.3 | 19.10.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007EP09107 | Priority number, date | DE20061056338 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006056338 | [2009/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008064745 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2098088 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2098088 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, H04W64/00 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,KR,US);
G01S5/0263 (EP,KR,US);
G01S5/0284 (EP,US);
G01S5/14 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/38] | H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/37] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/41] |
Former [2018/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINES ENDGERÄTS IN EINEM MOBILFUNKNETZ | [2009/37] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINATION OF THE POSITION OF A TERMINAL IN A MOBILE COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2009/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER LA POSITION D'UN TERMINAL DANS UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION MOBILE | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2007 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | IT | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | AT | 19.10.2018 | LU | 19.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.10.2007 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 19.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 19.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.10.2018 | ||
LU | 19.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
MT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.10.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.10.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
LU | 19.10.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2359699 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,10-12 * page 2, line 5 - line 10 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 22 * * abstract * [Y] 2; | [X]US2003063589 (HAINES ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1,10-12 * paragraphs [0005] , [0035] , [0041] * * abstract *; | [Y]US2003130793 (PATWARI NEAL K [US], et al) [Y] 2,9 * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0037] ** abstract *; | [XY]US2006052115 (KHUSHU SANJEEV [US]) [X] 6-8 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0041] * * figure 2 * [Y] 9 |