EP2094116 - SOLID OR AQUEOUS ALKALINE PREPARATION COMPRISING A CREATINE COMPONENT, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlzChem Trostberg GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GASTNER, Thomas Franz-Schubert-Strasse 7b 84518 Garching an der Alz / DE | [2009/41] |
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
GASTNER, Thomas Garchinger Str. 16A 84549 Engelsberg / DE | Representative(s) | Böhm, Brigitte Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Böhm, Brigitte Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07819368.7 | 26.10.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007EP09324 | Priority number, date | DE20061050931 | 28.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006050931 | [2009/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008052712 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2094116 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2094116 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/305, A61K31/198 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/306, A23V2200/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | FESTE ODER WÄSSRIGE ALKALISCHE ZUBEREITUNG UMFASSEND EINE KREATIN-KOMPONENTE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2009/36] | English: | SOLID OR AQUEOUS ALKALINE PREPARATION COMPRISING A CREATINE COMPONENT, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THE USE THEREOF | [2009/36] | French: | PRÉPARATION ALCALINE SOLIDE OU AQUEUSE COMPRENANT UN COMPOSANT DE CRÉATINE, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 30.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2011
15.03.2011
ADMISSIBLE All American Pharmaceutical & Natural Foods Corporation 2376 Main Street Billings MT 59105 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2011
15.03.2011
ADMISSIBLE All American Pharmaceutical & Natural Foods Corporation 2376 Main Street Billings MT 59105 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | 30.03.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.07.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.01.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 30.01.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 19.05.2010 | MT | 19.05.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | GR | 20.08.2010 | IS | 19.09.2010 | PT | 20.09.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | FI | 26.10.2011 | IE | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LU | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | HU | 27.10.2011 | BG | 30.04.2012 | [2016/03] |
Former [2014/44] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LU | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
HU | 27.10.2011 | ||
BG | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LU | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
HU | 27.10.2011 | ||
BG | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/47] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LU | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
HU | 27.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
MT | 19.05.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
HU | 27.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | EE | 19.05.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 20.08.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
PT | 20.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5908864 (CASEY THEODORE R [US]) [X] 1-9,12-19 * column 2, line 32 - line 53; claims 3,4 * * column 3, line 8 - line 35 *; | [Y]DE19830768 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]) [Y] 10 * example -; claim - *; | [XDY]US6399661 (GOLINI JEFFREY M [US]) [XD] 1-6,8,9,11-19 * column 2, line 50 - line 65; figure 2 * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 24 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 3 * [Y] 10; | [X]WO02069740 (HOWARD FOUNDATION [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,12-19 * page 18, paragraph 4 - page 19; figures 6-8; example 5; claims 1,4,8,10-14,18; table 1 *; | [A]WO2005120246 (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [A] 10* page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 * |