EP2089301 - PLANT FOR TRANSPORTING CARGO AND/OR FROM A SHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APM Terminals Management B.V. Anna Van Saksenlaan 71 2593 HW Den Haag / NL | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE JONG, Angelo Wilderveld 16 3451 LG Vleuten / NL | 02 /
UGLVIG, Laurids Avenida de los Cortijos, s/n Valgrande 2-08-01 11310 Sotogrande Cadiz / ES | 03 /
KJELDSEN, Anders Fondo 8 11310 Sotogrande Cadiz / ES | 04 /
JORDAN, Michael Alex 6219 Bullard Drive Oakland, CA 94611 / US | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Münzer, Marc Eric Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Münzer, Marc Eric Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 07819863.7 | 19.11.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007EP09987 | Priority number, date | EP20060388062 | 17.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06388062 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008058763 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089301 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089301 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65G63/00, B66C19/00 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
B65G63/004 (EP,US);
B65G63/00 (KR);
B65G67/60 (KR);
B66C19/00 (KR);
B66C19/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Extension states | AL | 13.11.2008 | BA | 13.11.2008 | HR | 13.11.2008 | MK | 13.11.2008 | RS | 13.11.2008 | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUM GEPÄCKTRANSPORT VON EINEM ODER AUF EIN SCHIFF | [2009/34] | English: | PLANT FOR TRANSPORTING CARGO AND/OR FROM A SHIP | [2009/34] | French: | EQUIPEMENT POUR LE TRANSPORT D'UN CHARGEMENT VERS ET/OU À PARTIR D'UN BATEAU | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | IS | 25.12.2010 | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/03] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0790955 (FANTUZZI REGGIANE SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-19* the whole document * |