EP2068787 - DEVICE FOR RESHAPING BONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honegger, Norina Humrigenflurstrasse 60 8704 Herrliberg / CH | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / SG / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2009/25] | Dr. Graf & Partner Intellectual Property Postfach 518 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 07820785.9 | 01.10.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007EP60403 | Priority number, date | EP20060121632 | 02.10.2006 Original published format: EP 06121632 | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008040708 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2068787 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2068787 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/08 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
A61F5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM UMFORMEN VON KNOCHEN | [2009/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR RESHAPING BONES | [2009/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DÉFORMER DES OS | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2007 | CY | 04.01.2012 | CZ | 04.01.2012 | DK | 04.01.2012 | EE | 04.01.2012 | FI | 04.01.2012 | IE | 04.01.2012 | LT | 04.01.2012 | LV | 04.01.2012 | MT | 04.01.2012 | PL | 04.01.2012 | RO | 04.01.2012 | SE | 04.01.2012 | SI | 04.01.2012 | SK | 04.01.2012 | TR | 04.01.2012 | BG | 04.04.2012 | GR | 05.04.2012 | IS | 04.05.2012 | PT | 04.05.2012 | LU | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
LU | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
TR | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
MT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
SK | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2012 | ||
DK | 04.01.2012 | ||
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
RO | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
EE | 04.01.2012 | ||
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SE | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IE | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 04.01.2012 | |
FI | 04.01.2012 | ||
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
LV | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 04.01.2012 | |
LT | 04.01.2012 | ||
PL | 04.01.2012 | ||
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
PT | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 04.01.2012 | |
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 04.01.2012 | |
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
BG | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 04.01.2012 | |
SI | 04.01.2012 | ||
IS | 04.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 04.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE76055 (WEIDLER H) [A] 1,15,16 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]DE321737 (MAX BAGINSKI) [A] 1,15,16 * page 1, line 13; figures 1-3; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE811255 (WESCHE WILHELM) [A] 1,15,16 * page 1, lines 1-14; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE1104655 (GUSTAVE AUFRICHT) [A] 1,15,16 * column 1, lines 1-7; figures 1,8; claims 1,9 *; | [A]US3742943 (MALMIN O) [A] 1,15* abstract * | by applicant | DE321737 | DE811255 |