EP2106479 - DRYING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODEN, Herbert Spratzerner Kirchenweg 108/7 3100 St. Poelten / AT | 02 /
ATTWENGER, Robert Braungasse 46 1170 Wien / AT | 03 /
KLOIBHOFER, Rainer Altenmarkstr. 9 3371 Neumarkt / AT | [2009/41] | Application number, filing date | 07821322.0 | 15.10.2007 | [2009/41] | WO2007EP60955 | Priority number, date | DE20061051052 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006051052 | [2009/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008052876 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2106479 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D21F5/00, D21F5/04 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
D21F5/004 (EP,US);
D21F5/044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/41] | Title | German: | TROCKNUNGSANORDNUNG | [2009/41] | English: | DRYING ARRANGEMENT | [2009/41] | French: | DISPOSITION DE SÉCHAGE | [2009/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005100684 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 9; figure 1 * * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 31 *; | [Y]WO2006072506 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column A; figure 1 * * page 5, line 4 - line 8 * * page 6, lines 21,22 * * page 7, lines 17-20 *; | [DA]DE19723163 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * column W * |