EP2102041 - BEARING SEAT ARRANGEMENT FOR AXIAL AND RADIAL FIXATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAWIGHORST, Achim Scheffelweg 7 77830 Buehlertal / DE | [2009/39] | Application number, filing date | 07821453.3 | 17.10.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007EP61088 | Priority number, date | DE20061059346 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006059346 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008071490 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102041 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/16, F16C35/04, F16C35/067, H02K5/173 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B60S1/166 (EP);
B60S1/16 (KR);
F16C35/04 (KR);
F16C35/067 (EP,KR);
H02K5/173 (KR);
H02K7/081 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | LAGERSITZANORDNUNG ZUR AXIALEN UND RADIALEN FIXIERUNG | [2009/39] | English: | BEARING SEAT ARRANGEMENT FOR AXIAL AND RADIAL FIXATION | [2009/39] | French: | ENSEMBLE SIÈGE DE PALIER POUR IMMOBILISATION AXIALE ET RADIALE | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1517054 (TIMKEN CO [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraph [0022] *; | [A]JP2002333015 (ASMO CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [E]WO2007119915 (DONGYANG MECHATRONICS CORP [KR], et al) [E] 1-9,16 * the whole document * |