EP2117776 - ECCENTRIC GRINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROEHM, Heiko Ludwigstrasse 50 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
HEBER, Andreas Rembrandtweg 6 70794 Filderstadt / DE | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/50] | Application number, filing date | 07822050.6 | 30.10.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007EP61696 | Priority number, date | DE20061061634 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006061634 | [2009/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008080665 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117776 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117776 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B24B23/03 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
B24B23/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | EXZENTERSCHLEIFER | [2009/47] | English: | ECCENTRIC GRINDER | [2009/47] | French: | PONCEUSE EXCENTRIQUE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2007 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | FI | 14.12.2011 | IE | 14.12.2011 | IT | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | LV | 14.12.2011 | MT | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | PL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | BG | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | ES | 25.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5018314 (FUSHIYA FUSAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,9,11 * column 5, lines 8-12 * * figures 1,8-10 *; | [X]FR2810914 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * page 1, lines 2-9 * * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 35 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 2 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB2376651 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10148339 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10148339 |