EP2127055 - APPARATUS FOR HOLDING AN ELECTRICAL MACHIEN SUCH THAT IT IS DECOUPLED FROM VIBRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIEL, Andreas Erlenweg 10 76593 Gernsbach-Lautenbach / DE | [2009/49] | Application number, filing date | 07822107.4 | 31.10.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007EP61760 | Priority number, date | DE20061061582 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006061582 | [2009/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008080669 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2127055 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/24, H02K5/26 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
H02K5/24 (EP,US);
F04D25/0606 (EP,US);
F04D29/668 (EP,US);
F16F15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHWINGUNGSENTKOPPELTEN HALTERUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE | [2009/49] | English: | APPARATUS FOR HOLDING AN ELECTRICAL MACHIEN SUCH THAT IT IS DECOUPLED FROM VIBRATION | [2009/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN D'UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE AVEC DÉCOUPLAGE DES VIBRATIONS | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.02.2017 | 09.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/27] | 27.02.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO2004112219 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [DX] 1-6 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 11, paragraph 2; figures 1-2b *; | [X]WO0118424 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * page 4, line 27 - page 7, line 4; figures 1-3,7 *; | [X]DE4321633 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 11 - line 50 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 42; figures 1,2,6-8 * | by applicant | DE4321633 | WO0118424 | DE10326996 |