EP2206138 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TREATED SURFACE AND VACUUM PLASMA SOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Surface Solutions Ltd., Pfäffikon Churerstrasse 120 8808 Pfäffikon SZ / CH | [2017/21] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Oerlikon Trading AG, Trübbach 9477 Trübbach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMM, Juergen Muehlebuendtestrasse 12 CH-7304 Maienfeld / CH | 02 /
WIDRIG, Beno Rheinstrasse 13 CH-7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | 03 /
KURAPOV, Denis Hanflaenderweg 5 CH-8880 Walenstadt / CH | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | [2017/12] |
Former [2010/28] | Troesch, Jacques J. Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Schwäntenmos 14 8126 Zumikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 07822148.8 | 01.11.2007 | [2010/28] | WO2007EP61805 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009056173 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2206138 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2206138 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2206138 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, C23C14/00, C23C14/22, C23C14/35, C23C14/54 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
H01J37/32009 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/54 (KR,US);
C23C14/0036 (KR,US);
C23C14/228 (KR,US);
C23C14/35 (US);
C23C14/351 (US);
H01J37/32 (KR);
H01J37/32055 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32477 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32541 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/28] | H01J37/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2010/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BEHANDELTEN OBERFLÄCHE UND VAKUUMPLASMAQUELLEN | [2010/28] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TREATED SURFACE AND VACUUM PLASMA SOURCES | [2010/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE SURFACE TRAITÉE ET DE SOURCES DE PLASMA SOUS VIDE | [2010/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 14.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10178841.2 / EP2267756 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2007 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | IE | 01.11.2017 | LU | 01.11.2017 | MT | 01.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.11.2007 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.11.2007 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
IE | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
MT | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
LU | 01.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1628323 (JDS UNIPHASE CORP [US]) [X] 27,28,34,36,37,42,44 * paragraphs [0051] , [0052]; figures 1a,1b * * paragraph [0086]; figure 11 *; | [X]US4038171 (MOSS RONALD W, et al) [X] 19,20,27,32,42,46 * column 3, line 1 - line 67; figure 1 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [DYA]DE4306611 (LEYBOLD AG [DE]) [DY] 24,30,38 * page 4, line 11 - line 31; figure 1 * * page 4, line 55 - page 5, line 50; figure 4 * [A] 24,30,37; | [X]US5605637 (SHAN HONGCHING [US], et al) [X] 19,20,22,27,28,32,34,36,40 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]US6446572 (BRCKA JOZEF [US]) [A] 1-46 * column 5, line 3 - line 39; figure 1 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 37; figures 2A,2B ** column 10, line 1 - line 53; figure 5 *; | [X]US6495000 (ATKINSON JAMES MIKEL [US], et al) [X] 19,20,27,32,42 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 13; figure 3 *; | [XAY]US2007034501 (BENDER EFIM [IL]) [X] 19,20,27,32,42,43,45 * paragraph [0100] * * paragraphs [0117] - [0120] - [0122]; figure 3B * [A] 1-18,21,23,25,26,29,31,33,35,39,41 [Y] 24,30,38 | Examination | US6010636 | US2005040144 | by applicant | - L. DORF ET AL., "Experimental studies of anode sheath phenomena in a Hall thruster discharge", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (2005), vol. 97, page 103309, XP012069312 |