EP2104701 - BIOCIDAL COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMP, Simon Luitpoldstrasse 114 b 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
KOCH, Oliver Hintere Lisgewann 36 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 03 /
EK, Monica Teknikringen 56 100 44 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
WESTMAN, Eva-Helena Ringrägen 143 11661 Stockholm / SE | 05 /
WAGBERG, Lars Skäddvägen 9 181 30 Lidingö / SE | 06 /
HÄHNLE, Hans-Joachim Böhläckerstr. 27 67435 Neustadt / DE | 07 /
FEUERHAKE, Robert Rheindammstrasse 56 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 07822182.7 | 05.11.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007EP61853 | Priority number, date | EP20060023439 | 10.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06023439 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008055857 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104701 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, D21H11/20, D21H17/69, C09D5/14, A01N25/00 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
A01N25/34 (EP,US);
A01N33/04 (EP,US);
A01N33/12 (EP,US);
A01N33/20 (EP,US);
A01N47/28 (EP,US);
C09D5/14 (EP,US);
D21H11/20 (EP,US);
D21H17/69 (EP,US);
D21H21/36 (EP,US);
D21H27/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/34, A01N25/10, A01N33/04, A01N33/12, A01N33/20, A01N47/28 (EP,US);
A01N33/04, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N33/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N33/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | BIOZIDE BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2009/40] | English: | BIOCIDAL COATINGS | [2009/40] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS À EFFET BIOCIDE | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 31.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0051354 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 36 * * example 5 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0331528 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 7, line 29 - line 35 * * page 7, line 47 - line 53 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0472990 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,17 * abstract * * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 42 * * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 21 ** page 9, line 47 - line 52 *; | [X]WO9912418 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 20 * claim - *; | [A]WO9912424 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO02095122 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 20 * example 6 *; | [X]US2003091612 (SABESAN SUBRAMANIAM [US]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0021] , [0023] , [0026] , [0029] - [0031] *; | [A]WO2005007706 (DOW REICHHOLD SPECIALTY LATEX [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - line 14 * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 21 * * page 7, line 21 - line 23 * * page 13, line 6 - line 15 *; | [A]WO2005019315 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 8, line 1 - line 7 * * page 10, line 36 - page 11, line 16 *; | [A]WO2005061610 (KALLE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 29 * * page 7, line 11 - line 28 * * claim - *; | [A]DE102004014483 (FOERDERUNG VON MEDIZIN BIO UND [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] * |