EP2089839 - Method of marking a secure electronic support, and the secure electronic support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/34] | METHOD OF MAKING A SECURE ELECTRIC OR ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT ELEMENT, ELEMENT OBTAINED AND SUPPORT INTEGRATING SAID ELEMENT | ||
[2011/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBLES, Laurence Route Source des Nayes 83640 Saint Zacharie / FR | 02 /
BANCHELIN, Xavier 123, chemin des Amaryllis 13012 Marseille / FR | [2011/43] |
Former [2009/34] | 01 /
ROBLES, Laurence Route Source des Nayes 83640 Saint Zacharie / FR | ||
02 /
BANCHELIN, XAVIER 123, chemin des Amaryllis 13012 Marseille / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/43] | Application number, filing date | 07822263.5 | 06.11.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007EP61947 | Priority number, date | EP20060301139 | 09.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06301139 | [2009/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008055909 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089839 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089839 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, B42D15/00, G07D7/00 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
G07D7/01 (EP);
B42D25/355 (EP,US);
G06K19/0775 (EP);
G07D7/128 (EP);
B42D2033/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines sicheren elektronischen Trägers, und der sichere elektronische Träger | [2011/24] | English: | Method of marking a secure electronic support, and the secure electronic support | [2011/24] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'un support électronique sécurisé, et le support électronique sécurisé | [2011/24] |
Former [2009/34] | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES SICHEREN ELEKTRISCHEN ODER ELEKTRONISCHEN SCHALTUNGSELEMENTS, ERHALTENES ELEMENT UND DAS ELEMENT INTEGRIERENDE HALTERUNG | ||
Former [2009/34] | METHOD OF MAKING A SECURE ELECTRIC OR ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT ELEMENT, ELEMENT OBTAINED AND SUPPORT INTEGRATING SAID ELEMENT | ||
Former [2009/34] | PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN ELEMENT DE CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE OU ELECTRONIQUE SECURISE, ELEMENT OBTENU ET SUPPORT INTEGRANT LEDIT ELEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | HU | 26.10.2011 | IE | 26.10.2011 | IT | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | LU | 06.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | ES | 06.02.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LU | 06.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
LU | 06.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
LU | 06.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0065545 (VHP UGCHELEN BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,10,14,16 * figures 1,3,4 * * abstract ** page 10, lines 15-34 *; | [X]WO0227651 (GISECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,10,13-16,19,20 * figures 2,4,6A,6B * * page 10, line 3 - page 13, line 3 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 4 *; | [X]WO0250890 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,7-9,14,16-18 * figure 1 * * page 6, lines 17-29 * * page 7, lines 10,11 *; | [X]EP1492047 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,9,14,16,19,20 * figures 1,5a * * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0027] , [0031] , [0032] *; | [X]US2006075249 (HAYES RALPH E [US]) [X] 1-7,9-16 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] *; | [PX]EP1770605 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,6-10,14-17,19,20 * figure 17 * * paragraphs [0062] - [0064] * |