EP2049828 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE SAFE FILLING OF A TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14 Avenue des Béguines BP 68532 95892 Cergy Pontoise / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14 Avenue des Béguines BP 68532 95892 Cergy Pontoise / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONVAULT, Jacques 29, rue de Picardie 60110 Amblainville / FR | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Rolland, Jean-Christophe Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14 avenue des Béguines BP 68532 95892 Cergy Pontoise Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Rolland, Jean-Christophe Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14 avenue des Béguines BP 68532 95892 Cergy Pontoise Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823380.6 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007FR01327 | Priority number, date | FR20060007215 | 08.08.2006 Original published format: FR 0607215 | [2009/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008017756 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049828 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F17C5/00, F17C5/06, F17C13/02, F17C13/12, B67D5/373, B60S5/02 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
F17C5/06 (EP);
B67D7/32 (EP);
F17C13/025 (EP);
F17C13/123 (EP);
F17C5/007 (EP);
F17C2205/0364 (EP);
F17C2205/0376 (EP);
F17C2221/033 (EP);
F17C2223/0123 (EP);
F17C2223/036 (EP);
F17C2225/0123 (EP);
F17C2225/036 (EP);
F17C2250/043 (EP);
F17C2250/0478 (EP);
F17C2260/042 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHEREN FÜLLUNG EINES TANKS | [2009/17] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE SAFE FILLING OF A TANK | [2009/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REMPLISSAGE SECURISE D'UN RESERVOIR | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 19.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0088740 (PRIMUS SIEVERT AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,7,9-14 * the whole document * [A] 4-6; | [X]CA2232387 (SHEREX IND LTD [CA]) [X] 1-3,7-10,12,13 * the whole document *; | [X]US5720327 (FOSTER JR JAMES C [US]) [X] 1,7,9,10,12 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1279887 (GAVECO AB [SE]) [X] 10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5635770 (EVANS JR ALAN F [US] ET AL); | [A]DE10241688 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US6142191 (SUTTON HAROLD E [US] ET AL); | [A]US6021823 (HALE DAVID L [US]); | [A]FR2813246 (POUJOLS MAURICE [FR]); | [A]FR2816033 (GIAT IND SA [FR]); | [A]WO03029719 (EMER SRL [IT]; VALTEK S R L [IT]; GOBBI FRANCESCO [IT]; STEVANI LUIGI) |