EP2062237 - DETECTOR OF ATTEMPT TO BREACH A LOCK, LOCK, DOOR AND ALARM SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH A DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brimont, Madeleine 62 rue Taitbout 75009 Paris / FR | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Priori, Enrico, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Priori, Enrico, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823442.4 | 23.08.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007FR01394 | Priority number, date | WO2006FR01973 | 23.08.2006 Original published format: PCT/FR2006/001973 | [2009/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008023120 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2062237 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2062237 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/06, E05B17/18 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
G08B13/06 (EP,US);
E05B17/185 (EP,US);
Y10T70/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | G08B13/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | DETEKTOR EINES VERSUCHS, EINEN RIEGEL ZU BRECHEN, RIEGEL, TÜR UND ALARMSYSTEM MIT EINEM SOLCHEN DETEKTOR | [2009/22] | English: | DETECTOR OF ATTEMPT TO BREACH A LOCK, LOCK, DOOR AND ALARM SYSTEM COMPRISING SUCH A DETECTOR | [2009/22] | French: | DETECTEUR DE TENTATIVE D'EFFRACTION DE SERRURE, SERRURE, PORTE ET SYSTEME D'ALARME COMPORTANT UN TEL DETECTEUR | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2007 | AT | 25.01.2012 | CY | 25.01.2012 | CZ | 25.01.2012 | DK | 25.01.2012 | EE | 25.01.2012 | FI | 25.01.2012 | IE | 25.01.2012 | LT | 25.01.2012 | LV | 25.01.2012 | MT | 25.01.2012 | NL | 25.01.2012 | PL | 25.01.2012 | RO | 25.01.2012 | SE | 25.01.2012 | SI | 25.01.2012 | SK | 25.01.2012 | TR | 25.01.2012 | BG | 25.04.2012 | GR | 26.04.2012 | IS | 25.05.2012 | PT | 25.05.2012 | GB | 23.08.2012 | IT | 23.08.2012 | LU | 23.08.2012 | ES | 24.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | FR | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
GB | 23.08.2012 | ||
IT | 23.08.2012 | ||
LU | 23.08.2012 | ||
ES | 24.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
TR | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
GB | 23.08.2012 | ||
IT | 23.08.2012 | ||
ES | 24.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
MT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
GB | 23.08.2012 | ||
IT | 23.08.2012 | ||
ES | 24.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
GB | 23.08.2012 | ||
IT | 23.08.2012 | ||
ES | 24.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
GB | 23.08.2012 | ||
IT | 23.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
GB | 23.08.2012 | ||
IT | 23.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/27] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.01.2012 | |
CY | 25.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
SK | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
CZ | 25.01.2012 | ||
DK | 25.01.2012 | ||
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
RO | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
SI | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
EE | 25.01.2012 | ||
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
SE | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
IE | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 25.01.2012 | |
FI | 25.01.2012 | ||
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
LV | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 25.01.2012 | |
LT | 25.01.2012 | ||
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
PL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
PT | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
NL | 25.01.2012 | ||
BG | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 25.01.2012 | |
IS | 25.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2658853 (LIKA NICOLAS) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4419830 (EAK ELECTRONIC ALARM KROMER GM [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - line 66 ** column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 28 *; | [A]US5684457 (MILLER J CLAYTON [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 3 - line 34 * * column 9, line 46 - column 10, line 14 * * column 11, line 41 - line 55 * |