EP2069585 - Facing panel, in particular plasterboard panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/25] | IMPROVEMENT RELATING TO A FACING PANEL, IN PARTICULAR A PLASTERBOARD PANEL | ||
[2010/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLACOPLATRE 34, avenue Franklin Roosevelt 92150 Suresnes / FR | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEERAERT, Emmanuel Fortsteenweg 24 B-2650 Kapellen / BE | 02 /
BENKEMOUN, Yves 27, rue d'Estienne d'Orves F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | 03 /
BOURDON, Laurent 38, rue Robert Daugas F-16100 Cognac / FR | 04 /
CASALS, Rosa 5, Parc de la Bérangère F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | 05 /
DEFENDENTI, David 85, Chemin de Grandrupt F-88100 Saint-Die / FR | 06 /
DENIMAL, Jacques 79, rue du Bataillon de France F-60200 Compiègne / FR | 07 /
DURIAUD, Pierre Marie 7, rue des Courcieux F-78570 Andresy / FR | 08 /
FRITSCH, Alexandre 18, rue Neuve F-67800 Hoenheim / FR | 09 /
HAMELIN, Yves 1, Allée du Pourquoi Pas F-91000 Evry / FR | 10 /
LAROULANDIE, Christine 1, rue Boutard F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | 11 /
MAIMOUNI, Nadia 16, rue Salvador Allende F-92000 Nanterre / FR | 12 /
PERAUDEAU, Aurélie 44, rue de Fécamp F-75012 Paris / FR | 13 /
PEYRAT, Fabien 40 rue de la Rouselle F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | 14 /
PINEDE, Alain 11, Lieu-dit Le Planier F-33750 Baron / FR | 15 /
ROSIQUE, Patrick 3, rue du Puits Volants F-01800 Meximieux / FR | 16 /
VERHAEGHE, Marc Antoine 181, Avenue du Parc Monceau F-59000 Lille / FR | [2009/34] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
GEERAERT, Emmanuel Fortsteenweg 24 B-2650 Kapellen / BE | ||
02 /
BENKEMOUN, Yves 27, rue d'Estienne d'Orves F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | |||
03 /
BOURDON, Laurent 38, rue Robert Daugas F-16100 Cognac / FR | |||
04 /
CASALS, Rosa 5, Parc de la Bérangère F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | |||
05 /
DEFENDENTI, David 85, Chemin de Grandrupt F-88100 Saint-Die / FR | |||
06 /
DENIMAL, Jacques 79, rue du Bataillon de France F-60200 Compiègne / FR | |||
07 /
DURIAUD, Pierre Marie 7, rue des Courcieux F-78570 Andresy / FR | |||
08 /
FRITSCH, Alexandre 18, rue Neuve F-67800 Hoenheim / FR | |||
09 /
HAMELIN, Yves 1, Allée du Pourquoi Pas F-91000 Evry / FR | |||
10 /
LAROULANDIE, Christine 1, rue Boutard F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | |||
11 /
MAIMOUNI, Nadia 16, rue Salvador Allende F-92000 Nanterre / FR | |||
12 /
PERAUDEAU, Aurélie 138 Boulevard de la République F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | |||
13 /
PEYRAT, Fabien 40 rue de la Rouselle F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | |||
14 /
PINEDE, Alain 11, Lieu-dit Le Planier F-33750 Baron / FR | |||
15 /
ROSIQUE, Patrick 3, rue du Puits Volants F-01800 Meximieux / FR | |||
16 /
VERHAEGHE, Marc Antoine 181, Avenue du Parc Monceau F-59000 Lille / FR | Representative(s) | Hartmann, Jean-Luc Santarelli Immeuble Innopolis A, BP 388 31314 Labège Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Hartmann, Jean-Luc Santarelli Immeuble Innopolis A, BP 388 31314 Labège Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823497.8 | 12.09.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007FR01470 | Priority number, date | FR20060008077 | 15.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0608077 | [2009/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008031941 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2069585 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2069585 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/04 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
E04C2/043 (EP,US);
E04F13/141 (EP,US);
Y10T428/197 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24198 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24215 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24488 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Verkleidungsplatte, insbesondere Gipskartonplatte | [2010/03] | English: | Facing panel, in particular plasterboard panel | [2010/03] | French: | PLAQUE DE PAREMENT, NOTAMMENT PLAQUE DE PLATRE | [2009/25] |
Former [2009/25] | EINE VERKLEIDUNGSPLATTE, INSBESONDERE EINE GIPSKARTONPLATTE, BETREFFENDE VERBESSERUNG | ||
Former [2009/25] | IMPROVEMENT RELATING TO A FACING PANEL, IN PARTICULAR A PLASTERBOARD PANEL | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 28.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | MT | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | LU | 12.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | HU | 19.02.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
LU | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 18.08.2010 | |
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 12.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1330347 (RICHARDSON ALFONSO A) [Y] 8-12 * page 1, lines 27-29; figure 2 *; | [XY]FR2376272 (DOUGLASS JAMES [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 26; figures 1,5 * [Y] 5,8-12; | [Y]DE8119141U (J. & OTTO KREBBER GMBH & CO KG, 4200 OBERHAUSEN, DE) [Y] 8-12 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5390458 (MENCHETTI ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 9-12* column 3, lines 14-42; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0663483 (TOSCOPAN S R L [IT]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 19; figures 2A,2B,3B,5-10 * [Y] 5,8-12; | [X]EP0849415 (JANSEN PRODUCTS NAAMLOZE VENNO [BE]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0053860 (BPB PLC [GB]) [Y] 5 * page 3, lines 8-15; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1361317 (LEHBRINK GMBH & CO KG MASCHINE [DE]) [Y] 8-12 * abstract *; | [X]DE10241223 (INBAU BAUSYSTEME GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract *; | [X]DE29825125U (VOGL ERICH R [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * |