EP2024568 - MATERIAL IN SHEET FORM HAVING A WINDOW, ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND SECURITY DOCUMENT COMPRISING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arjowiggins Security 117 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Arjowiggins Security 117 Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 ISSY LES MOULINEAUX / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUBLET, Pierre 1, rue de la Laiterie 77160 Saint-Brice / FR | 02 /
CAMUS, Michel 390, avenue Jean Jaurès 38140 Rives sur Fure / FR | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Tanty, François Nony & Associés 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823503.3 | 05.06.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007FR51376 | Priority number, date | FR20060004975 | 06.06.2006 Original published format: FR 0604975 | [2009/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008006983 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2024568 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2024568 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/30, D21H21/42, D21H21/44, D21H27/32, D21F11/08 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
D21H27/30 (EP,US);
D21F1/44 (EP,US);
D21H21/42 (EP,US);
D21H21/44 (EP,US);
D21H27/32 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24967 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIAL IN BLATTFORM UND MIT EINEM FENSTER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND SICHERHEITSDOKUMENT DAMIT | [2009/08] | English: | MATERIAL IN SHEET FORM HAVING A WINDOW, ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND SECURITY DOCUMENT COMPRISING IT | [2009/08] | French: | MATÉRIAU EN FEUILLE COMPORTANT UNE FENÊTRE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET DOCUMENT DE SÉCURITÉ LE COMPRENANT | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | HU | 15.09.2010 | IE | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | MT | 15.09.2010 | PL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | LU | 05.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0059056 (PORTALS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [DX]EP0229645 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [DX] 28 * figure 1 * * figure 7 *; | [AD]EP0625431 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-42 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO9509274 (ARJO WIGGINS SA [FR], et al) [DY] 1-42* figures 1-4 *; | [DX]EP0860298 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [DX] 28 * figure 1 * * figure 4 * |