EP2064800 - ROTARY ELECTRICAL MACHINE INTENDED TO BE MOUNTED ON A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2, rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2 Rue André Boulle 94046 Creteil Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
METRAL, Jean-Sébastien 93, rue Hector Berlioz 38290 La Verpillière / FR | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | de Lambilly Delorme, Marie Pierre Valéo Equipements Electriques Moteur Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André-Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | de Lambilly Delorme, Marie Pierre Valéo Equipements Electriques Moteur 2, rue André-Boulle 94046 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823725.2 | 17.08.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007FR51825 | Priority number, date | FR20060053569 | 05.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0653569 | [2009/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008029044 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064800 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/04, H02K7/00, // H02K5/15 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
H02K7/003 (EP);
H02K5/04 (EP);
H02K5/15 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | H02K5/04, H02K7/04, H02K5/15 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | FÜR ANBRINGUNG IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG BESTIMMTE ELEKTRISCHE DREHMASCHINE | [2009/23] | English: | ROTARY ELECTRICAL MACHINE INTENDED TO BE MOUNTED ON A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2009/23] | French: | MACHINE ELECTRIQUE TOURNANTE DESTINEE A ETRE MONTEE SUR UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 02.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.12.2018 | 11.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/44] | 17.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2005012415 (HATANO KENTA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-5,11 * page 2, paragraph 47 - page 3, paragraph 55; figures 1,2,5 * [A] 12; | [XY]EP0727865 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7 * column 1, line 37 - line 55; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 1-4,7-10; | [Y]DE19506925 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4,10 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 9 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 45; figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]GB2205004 (LICENTIA GMBH LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 7-9 * page 4, line 4 - page 6, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB988209 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 1-3,7 * page 1, line 9 - line 69; figures 2-4; claim 1 *; | [XA]WO2006034922 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]; KOPF FRANK [DE]; LIEDEL MARKUS [DE]; WIELAND B) [X] 1-3,7 * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 1; figures 5a,5b * [A] 5,8,11; | [A]DE3931942 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4,10 * page 1, line 6 - page 3, line 51; figures 1,5 * | Examination | US5619082 | JPS5941135 | GB2037373 |