EP2061411 - PNEUMATIC VITREOTOME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corneal Innovation 4 Rue Marivaux 75002 Paris / FR | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAGNEPAIN, Cédric 17 rue des recouts Résidence l'Hermitage Apt 48 Bat.4 F-74370 Pringy / FR | 02 /
ANDRE, Jean-Marc 238 impasse Chalet F-73230 Saint Alban Leysse / FR | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Albin, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2010/45] |
Former [2009/22] | Cardy, Sophie Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823785.6 | 07.09.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007FR51889 | Priority number, date | FR20060053635 | 08.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0653635 | [2009/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008029066 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2061411 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2061411 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
A61F9/00763 (EP,US);
A61F9/00736 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00544 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCHES VITREOTOM | [2009/22] | English: | PNEUMATIC VITREOTOME | [2009/22] | French: | VITREOTOME PNEUMATIQUE | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.03.2011 | CZ | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | IE | 02.03.2011 | LT | 02.03.2011 | LV | 02.03.2011 | MT | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SI | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | IS | 02.07.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | LU | 07.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
LU | 07.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
CZ | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
IE | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SI | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.03.2011 | |
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4577629 (MARTINEZ MIGUEL [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 67 *[A] 6-8; | [XA]US4696298 (HIGGINS DANIEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 10 * [A] 6-8; | [X]WO0115640 (ALCON UNIVERSAL LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 28 *; | [XA]US6575990 (WANG CARL C [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 43 - column 10, line 26 * [A] 6-8 | by applicant | US5176628 |