EP2063796 - LUMBAR INTER-SPINE PROSTHESIS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spineart SA 20 Route de Pré Bois, CP 1813 1217 Meyrin / CH | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANGIONE, Paolo 73 rue Xavier Arnozan F-33600 Pessac / FR | 02 /
LEVIEUX, Jérôme 324 Route de Lausanne CH-1293 Bellevue / CH | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07823833.4 | 14.09.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007FR51938 | Priority number, date | FR20060008155 | 18.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0608155 | [2009/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008034996 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063796 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063796 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
A61B17/7062 (EP,US);
A61B17/70 (KR);
A61F2/44 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUMBARZWISCHENWIRBELPROTHESE UND IHRE ANWENDUNGEN | [2009/23] | English: | LUMBAR INTER-SPINE PROSTHESIS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2009/23] | French: | PROTHESE INTER-EPINEUSE LOMBAIRE ET SES APPLICATIONS | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 13.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.2009 | CY | 23.12.2009 | CZ | 23.12.2009 | DK | 23.12.2009 | EE | 23.12.2009 | FI | 23.12.2009 | IE | 23.12.2009 | LT | 23.12.2009 | LV | 23.12.2009 | MT | 23.12.2009 | NL | 23.12.2009 | PL | 23.12.2009 | RO | 23.12.2009 | SE | 23.12.2009 | SI | 23.12.2009 | SK | 23.12.2009 | TR | 23.12.2009 | BG | 23.03.2010 | GR | 24.03.2010 | IS | 23.04.2010 | PT | 23.04.2010 | HU | 24.06.2010 | LU | 14.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 14.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IE | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4000086 (CODMAN & SHURTLEFF [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 59 - line 66; figure 1 * * figures 2,7A,7B *; | [DA]FR2722980 (SAMANI JACQUES [FR]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0743045 (GAZZANI ROMOLO IGINO [IT], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 33 - line 36; figures 13,14 * * column 5, line 46 - line 47; figures 21,23 *; | [A]FR2774581 (DIMSO SA [FR]) [A] 1* abstract * |