EP2076647 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE POWERED OPENING OF AN AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alfonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORNOU, Sébastien 5 Rue Forez Rez Du Jardin Des Lys 91940 Les Ulis / FR | [2009/28] | Application number, filing date | 07823870.6 | 27.09.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007FR52025 | Priority number, date | FR20060054176 | 10.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0654176 | [2009/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008043931 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2076647 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/00, E05F15/20 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
E05F15/43 (EP);
E05F2015/434 (EP);
E05Y2900/546 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER ANGETRIEBENEN KLAPPE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2009/28] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE POWERED OPENING OF AN AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE | [2009/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN OUVRANT MOTORISE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/41] | 22.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US2004090203 (APPEL JOSEF [DE], et al) [DA] 1-7 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] * * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] * * figure - *; | [A]DE19522760 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-17 * * column 2, lines 32-45 * * column 3, lines 2-11 * * column 3, lines 47-53 *; | [A]DE10340592 (CTS FAHRZEUG DACHSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP1564358 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [DA] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0066750 | GB2340178 | FR2814771 | DE10117516 | US6411054 | EP1564358 | - B. D. LUCAS; T. KANADE, "An Iterative Image Registration Technique with an Application to Stereo Vision", PROC. DARPA IMAGE UNDERSTANDING WORKSHOP, (1981), pages 121 - 130 |