EP2084497 - APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF DETERMINING AN ANGLE BETWEEN AN ELEMENT AND A MAGNETIC FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of Southampton Highfield Southampton SO17 1BJ / GB | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANNESSEN, Ole Gustav 103 Kingston Way Southampton SO18 2GQ / GB | 02 /
LEVITT, Malcolm Harris 5 Wallington Drive Eastleigh Southampton SO53 1TR / GB | [2019/02] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
JOHANNESSEN, Ole Gustav 103 Kingston Way Southampton SO18 2GQ / GB | ||
02 /
LEVITT, Malcolm Harris 5 Wallington Drive Eastleigh Southampton SO53 1TR / GB | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2009/32] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07824252.6 | 19.10.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007GB04003 | Priority number, date | GB20060021036 | 23.10.2006 Original published format: GB 0621036 | GB20060024006 | 01.12.2006 Original published format: GB 0624006 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008050098 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084497 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2084497 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14, G01R33/30, G01R33/07 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
G01R33/307 (EP,US);
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01R33/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | G01D5/14, G01R33/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES WINKELS ZWISCHEN EINEM ELEMENT UND EINEM MAGNETFELD | [2009/32] | English: | APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF DETERMINING AN ANGLE BETWEEN AN ELEMENT AND A MAGNETIC FIELD | [2009/32] | French: | APPAREIL POUR UN PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'ANGLE ENTRE UN ÉLÉMENT ET UN CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 05.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2007 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.10.2007 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE4442742 (BRUKER ANALYTISCHE MESSTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-15,24-30,32-36,44,45 * column 4, line 34 - column 7, line 10; figure .; claims 1-16 * [A] 23,31; | [X]US2002011837 (SATO TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,7,8,24,25,31,32* the whole document * |