EP2089792 - CAPACITANCE SENSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Limited Stratford Road Solihull, West Midlands B90 4AX / GB | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAZELDEN, Roger John 27 Middlesmoor Wilnecote Tamworth B77 4PL / GB | [2012/05] |
Former [2009/34] | 01 /
HAZELDEN, Roger John 27 Middlesmoor Wilnecote Tamworth B77 4PL / GB | Representative(s) | Harris, David James Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2012/05] |
Former [2009/34] | Harris, David James Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07824704.6 | 26.11.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007GB04503 | Priority number, date | GB20060023432 | 24.11.2006 Original published format: GB 0623432 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008062217 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2089792 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089792 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/044, B60K35/00 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
G06F3/041662 (EP,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US);
B60K2360/143 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1438 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | G06F3/044 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | KAPAZITÄTSMESSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/34] | English: | CAPACITANCE SENSING APPARATUS | [2009/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE CAPACITÉ | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 16.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2007 | AT | 01.02.2012 | BE | 01.02.2012 | CY | 01.02.2012 | CZ | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | IT | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | MT | 01.02.2012 | NL | 01.02.2012 | PL | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SE | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | TR | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | ES | 12.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
ES | 12.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
IT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
IS | 01.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5861875 (GERPHEIDE GEORGE E [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 5, line 3 - column 9, line 20 * * column 13, line 45 - column 14, line 29; figures 1-9,16,17 *; | [Y]WO2004053576 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 18; figure 5 *; | [A]US2004158374 (SUZUKI ISAMU [JP]) [A] 14,15* paragraphs [0035] - [0037]; figure 4 * | by applicant | US5565658 | US5861875 |