EP2066776 - DISSOLVED OXYGEN PROFILE TO INCREASE FERMENTATION PRODUCTIVITY AND ECONOMICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUCEDO, Victor M. C/O AIR LIQUIDE ARGENTINA Monsenor Magliano 3079 San Isidro 1642 BUENOS AIRES / AR | [2009/30] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
SAUCEDO, Victor M. 1113 Dolores St. 3 San Francisco, California 94110 / US | Representative(s) | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide Direction des Services De la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07825096.6 | 07.09.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007IB02628 | Priority number, date | US20060843608P | 11.09.2006 Original published format: US 843608 P | US20070746323 | 09.05.2007 Original published format: US 746323 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008032186 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2066776 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/04 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
C12M41/34 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | AUFGELÖSTES SAUERSTOFFPROFIL FÜR ERHÖHTE FERMENTATIONSPRODUKTIVITÄT UND ÖKONOMIE | [2009/24] | English: | DISSOLVED OXYGEN PROFILE TO INCREASE FERMENTATION PRODUCTIVITY AND ECONOMICS | [2009/24] | French: | PROFIL D'OXYGÈNE DISSOUS POUR AUGMENTER LA PRODUCTIVITÉ ET L'ECONOMIE DE FERMENTATION | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 07.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05304952 ; | [A]US3912585 (IIJIMA TOKUJI, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 61; figure 4a *; | [A]WO9000199 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * page 15, line 1 - line 5; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2818659 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * example 1 *; | [A]US2004091954 (LIN WENGLONG ROY [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0037] *; | [A]EP0092771 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 10 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 51, Database accession no. 1993-408318, XP002470271 & JPH05304952 A 19931119 (HOKKO CHEM IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |