EP2193034 - BIDIRECTIONAL IMAGING WITH VARYING SPEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kodak Graphic Communications Canada Company 3700 Gilmore Way Burnaby BC V5G 4M1 / CA | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREGRYM, Greg 1930 Edinburgh Street New Westminster BC V3M 2X5 / CA | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/23] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Départment Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07825184.0 | 25.09.2007 | [2010/23] | WO2007IB02797 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009040593 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2193034 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2193034 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/382, B41J2/455, B41M5/025, G02F1/133, H01L51/00 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
B41M5/38207 (EP,US);
B41M5/38221 (EP,US);
G02B5/201 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/23] | B41M5/26, B41J2/455, B41M5/025, G02F1/133 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | BIDIREKTIONALE BEBILDERUNG MIT VARIIERENDEN GESCHWINDIGKEITEN | [2012/14] | English: | BIDIRECTIONAL IMAGING WITH VARYING SPEEDS | [2010/23] | French: | PROCEDE BIDIRECTIONNEL À VITESSES VARIABLES POUR LA FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2012/14] |
Former [2010/23] | BIDIREKTIONALE ABBILDUNG MIT VARIIERENDEN GESCHWINDIGKEITEN | ||
Former [2010/23] | IMAGERIE BIDIRECTIONNELLE À VITESSES VARIABLES | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 13.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2007 | AT | 29.08.2012 | BE | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | IT | 29.08.2012 | LT | 29.08.2012 | LV | 29.08.2012 | MT | 29.08.2012 | PL | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | SE | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | IE | 25.09.2012 | LU | 25.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 29.10.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | ES | 10.12.2012 | IS | 29.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
LU | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 29.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 29.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 29.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 29.10.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
IE | 25.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003011672 (EMGE GARRY J [US], et al); | [A]EP1376715 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US2005266152 (NGUYEN KELVIN [US], et al) | International search | [A]US6582875 (KAY DAVID B [US], et al); | [A]US6595612 (BROWN CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003011672 | EP1376715 | US2005266152 |