EP2097593 - FLOOR PANEL AND FLOOR COVERING CONSISTING OF SUCH FLOOR PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flooring Industries Limited, SARL 10b, rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | [2014/35] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states Flooring Industries LTD./SARL. 10b Rue des Mérovingiens, (ZI Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIERS, Bernard Paul Joseph Nestor de Tièrestraat 128 9700 Eine / BE | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel Mohawk International Services, BVBA Patent department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel Unilin Industries, BVBA Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | ||
Former [2009/37] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 07825563.5 | 29.10.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007IB03310 | Priority number, date | BE20060000534 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: BE 200600534 | BE20070000154 | 27.03.2007 Original published format: BE 200700154 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008053333 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2097593 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
E04F15/02 (EP,US);
E04F15/02033 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0115 (EP,US);
E04F2201/025 (EP,US);
E04F2201/026 (EP,US);
E04F2201/028 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | BODENPLATTE UND AUS SOLCHEN BODENPLATTEN BESTEHENDER BODENBELAG | [2009/37] | English: | FLOOR PANEL AND FLOOR COVERING CONSISTING OF SUCH FLOOR PANELS | [2009/37] | French: | PANNEAU DE PLANCHER ET REVÊTEMENT DE SOL CONSISTANT EN DE TELS PANNEAUX DE PLANCHER | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 11.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/43] | 15.06.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 28.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO03087497 (KRONOSPAN TECH CO LTD [CY], et al) [X] 1-9,11,20-28,30,33-37,42-46 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 19, paragraph 3 * * page 30, paragraph 3 * * page 31, paragraph 2 - page 34, paragraph 2 * * page 36, paragraph 4 - page 37, paragraph 1 * * figure 3 * [Y] 10; | [DXAY]WO2005068747 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [DX] 5,45,46 * page 15, lines 10-20 * * page 19, lines 15-21 * * page 21, lines 1-35 * * page 26, paragraph 3; figures 1-7a,9a-9d * [A] 1-4,43,44 [Y] 10,15,19; | [XAY]DE10233105 (WERZALIT AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 12-14,16-18 * page 2, paragraphs 6-9 * * pages 3-4, paragraphs 11-13,24 * * page 4, paragraphs 27,33,34 * * page 5, paragraphs 37,41; figures 1-3b * [A] 1,5 [Y] 15,19 |