EP2047511 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND A DEVICE MANUFACTURED BY THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONSKY, Jan c/o NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | 02 /
VAN NOORT, Wibo, D. c/o NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | 03 /
VAN DALEN, Rob c/o NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew, et al NXP SEMICONDUCTORS UK LTD Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | [2014/09] |
Former [2009/16] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors IP Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07825935.5 | 19.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007IB52884 | Priority number, date | EP20060117740 | 24.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06117740 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008012737 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2047511 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L21/331, H01L21/336, H01L29/423, H01L29/737, H01L29/06, H01L29/165 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
H01L29/7802 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0623 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/0653 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/165 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66712 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/73 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/7813 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HALBLEITERVORRICHTUNG UND MIT DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE VORRICHTUNG | [2009/16] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND A DEVICE MANUFACTURED BY THE METHOD | [2009/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET DISPOSITIF FABRIQUÉ SELON CE PROCÉDÉ | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03044861 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 8,10,11 * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 1; figure 1 *; | [X]US2004014451 (SAPP STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 8,9,12 * paragraphs [0035] - [0052]; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US2004104448 (MARTY MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005277260 (COHEN GUY M [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document * |