EP2060005 - SINGLE SLOPE ANALOG-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trixell Z.I. Centr'alp 38430 Moirans / FR | [2017/22] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNOEIJ, Martijn F. High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MIEROP, Adrianus J. High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
THEUWISSEN, Albert J.P. High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
HUIJSING, Johan H. High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Collet, Alain, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2012/27] |
Former [2009/43] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/21] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07826085.8 | 22.08.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007IB53344 | Priority number, date | EP20060119903 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: EP 06119903 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008026129 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2060005 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060005 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/18 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H03M1/144 (EP,US);
H03M1/123 (EP,US);
H03M1/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/45] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SINGLE-SLOPE-ANALOG-DIGITAL-WANDLER | [2009/21] | English: | SINGLE SLOPE ANALOG-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER | [2009/21] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE À NUMÉRIQUE À PENTE UNIQUE | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2007 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | IT | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5321404 (MALLINSON A MARTIN [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * abstract * * figures 1-3,6 * * column 1, line 7 - line 10 * * column 1, line 18 - line 25 * * column 1, line 41 - line 45 * * column 2, line 29 - line 34 * * column 3, line 9 - line 28 * * column 7, line 13 - line 35 * * column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 20 *; | [X]US6346907 (DACY SUSAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 4,5 * * column 1, line 13 - line 35 * * column 1, line 50 - line 52 * * column 4, line 1 - line 52 * * column 5, line 6 - line 7 *; | [A] - SASAKI M ET AL, "A wide dynamic range CMOS image sensor with multiple short-time exposures", SENSORS, 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE VIENNA, AUSTRIA OCT. 24 - 27, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041024), ISBN 0-7803-8692-2, pages 967 - 972, XP010793568 [A] 1,9,10 * the whole document * |