EP2211937 - An intestinal irrigation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/31] | AN INTESTINAL IRRIGATION DEVICE AND METHOD OF USING DEVICE | ||
[2010/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MBH-International A/S Hejrevang 21 A 3450 Allero̸d / DK | [2011/33] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states MBH International A/S Hejrevang 21E 3450 Allero̸d / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BJERREGAARD, Henrik Bork Knabstrupvej 43 DK-2700 Bro̸nsho̸j / DK | 02 /
BALLE, Niels Strandboulevarden 78 DK-2100 Copenhagen O̸ / DK | 03 /
DORFELT, Christian Kaplevej 47 DK-2830 Virum S / DK | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2010/31] | Holme Patent A/S Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 07826916.4 | 30.10.2007 | [2010/31] | WO2007IB54401 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009056906 | Date: | 07.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2211937 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2211937 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2211937 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M3/02, A61G9/00 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
A61F5/442 (EP,US);
A61M3/0287 (EP,US);
A61M39/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Darmspülvorrichtung | [2010/50] | English: | An intestinal irrigation device | [2010/50] | French: | Dispositif d'irrigation intestinale | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/31] | DARMSPÜLVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2010/31] | AN INTESTINAL IRRIGATION DEVICE AND METHOD OF USING DEVICE | ||
Former [2010/31] | DISPOSITIF D'IRRIGATION INTESTINALE | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 08.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2011 | BE | 27.07.2011 | CY | 27.07.2011 | CZ | 27.07.2011 | EE | 27.07.2011 | FI | 27.07.2011 | HU | 27.07.2011 | IT | 27.07.2011 | LT | 27.07.2011 | LV | 27.07.2011 | MT | 27.07.2011 | PL | 27.07.2011 | RO | 27.07.2011 | SI | 27.07.2011 | SK | 27.07.2011 | TR | 27.07.2011 | BG | 27.10.2011 | GR | 28.10.2011 | LU | 30.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | ES | 07.11.2011 | IS | 27.11.2011 | PT | 28.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
TR | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
LU | 30.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
LU | 30.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
LU | 30.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
BE | 27.07.2011 | ||
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
PL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3672370 (MARSAN ARTHUR E) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 5, line 75; figures 1-17 *; | [A]US4182332 (DELANEY RICHARD P [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0150277 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5624419 (ERSEK ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2003229324 (KING LORI L [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0023] - [0037]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2005027266 (HOWLETT JIM D [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006189957 (HOWLETT JIM [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |