EP2066134 - Method and apparatus for improving the interpolation accuracy of chrominance signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/23] | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND DECODING METHOD, THEIR DEVICE, THEIR PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM CONTAINING THE PROGRAM | ||
[2015/09] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANDOH, Yukihiro c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
KAMIKURA, Kazuto c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
YASHIMA, Yoshiyuki c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07829308.1 | 05.10.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007JP69570 | Priority number, date | JP20060276074 | 10.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006276074 | [2009/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008044637 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2066134 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/154, H04N19/186, H04N19/117, H04N19/17, H04N19/59, H04N19/172, H04N19/61, H04N19/136 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H04N19/59 (EP,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,KR,US);
H04N11/04 (KR);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/154 (EP,US);
H04N19/17 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | H04N11/04, H04N7/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2009/50] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung der Interpolationsgenauigkeit von Chrominanzsignalen | [2015/09] | English: | Method and apparatus for improving the interpolation accuracy of chrominance signals | [2015/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour améliorer la précision d'interpolation d'un signal de chrominance | [2015/09] |
Former [2009/23] | VIDEOKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -DEKODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR, PROGRAMM DAFÜR UND SPEICHERMEDIUM MIT DEM PROGRAMM | ||
Former [2009/23] | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND DECODING METHOD, THEIR DEVICE, THEIR PROGRAM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM CONTAINING THE PROGRAM | ||
Former [2009/23] | PROCÉDÉS DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO, LEUR DISPOSITIF, LEUR PROGRAMME, ET LE SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE CONTENANT LE PROGRAMME | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | Translation filed | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 12.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.07.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/11] | 06.10.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/11] | Appeal following examination | 03.09.2015 | Appeal received No. T2208/15 | 26.10.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.10.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 06.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP12152580.2 / EP2448269 | EP12152586.9 / EP2448270 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO03058945 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 8,16 * the whole document *[A] 7,15,19; | [IY]US2005053294 (MUKERJEE KUNAL [US], et al) [I] 7,15,19 * abstract * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0122] * * paragraph [0201] * * figure 20 * [Y] 8,16 | International search | [X]JP2003274190 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2003274193 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2006197144 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2000181438 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH06303608 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | Examination | WO9955013 | US6175592 | US2004076333 | by applicant | JP2006276074 | - HIROSHI SUGITA; AKIRA TAGUCHI, "Chrominance Signal Interpolation of YUV4:2:0 Format Color Images", IEICE (THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS) TRANSACTIONS, (2005), vol. J88-A, no. 6, pages 751 - 760 | - TAKASHI MIURA ET AL., "A Color Image Compression Scheme Based on the Adaptive Orthogonalized Transform - Accelerated by Sorted Dictionary", IEICE (THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS) TRANSACTIONS, (200211), vol. J85-D2, no. 11, pages 1672 - 1682 |