EP2072184 - JIG AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING CYLINDER BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINKAI, Tomoyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
HARADA, Takahiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
ASAYAMA, Kazuhiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
WATANABE, Kazuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2009/26] | 01 /
SHINKAI, Tomoyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
HARADA, Takahiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
ASAYAMA, Kazuhiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
WATANABE, Kazuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/26] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07829532.6 | 03.10.2007 | [2009/26] | WO2007JP69794 | Priority number, date | JP20060275458 | 06.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006275458 | [2009/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008044719 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072184 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2072184 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B24B33/02, B23B41/12, B23Q3/00, F02F1/00 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
B23Q3/062 (EP,US);
B24B33/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/30] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BOHRVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINES ZYLINDERBLOCKS | [2009/26] | English: | JIG AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING CYLINDER BLOCK | [2009/26] | French: | GABARIT ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UN BLOC-CYLINDRE | [2009/26] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | Translation filed | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 07.05.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JP2000052228 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [Y]JP2004243514 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2005199378 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPS56134169 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2004036511 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JPS62287965 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JPS597448 (TOYO KOGYO CO) | by applicant | JP2004243514 | JP2000052228 |