EP2078520 - CARBON DIOXIDE EXTERNAL APPLICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neochemir, Inc. 2-20, Goko-dori 4-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0087 / JP | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Masaya 7-22-309 Sekimoricho 3-chome Suma-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 654-0073 / JP | 02 /
DAIKYO, Toshiya NEOCHEMIR INC. 2-20, Goko-dori 4-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-0087 / JP | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07829976.5 | 17.10.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007JP70242 | Priority number, date | JP20060283291 | 18.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006283291 | [2009/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008047829 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078520 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61H33/14, A61H35/00 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
A61H35/00 (EP,US);
A61M35/30 (EP,US);
A61H2033/145 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0103 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0207 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0228 (EP,US);
A61H2201/025 (EP,US);
A61H2205/06 (EP,US);
A61H2205/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/29] | A61H33/02, A61H33/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | EXTERNE KOHLENDIOXID-APPLIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/29] | English: | CARBON DIOXIDE EXTERNAL APPLICATION DEVICE | [2009/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION EXTERNE DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2009 | Translation filed | 14.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 13.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE67661 (LUHMANN, E.; ROMMENHÖLLER, C. G.) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, column l, paragraphs 2,5; figure - * [I] 6; | [XI]JPH07171189 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0014] , [0015] , [0028] , [0029] , [0034] , [0035]; figures 1,5-7; claims 3,4 * [I] 6; | [XI]JP2006263253 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * [I] 6 | International search | [X]JP2005058745 (NEXTIER KK); | [Y]WO2004002393 (NEOCHEMIR INC [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2000319187 | JPS62286922 | WO2004002393 | JP2005058745 |