EP2078524 - ADHESIVE SKIN PATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS, MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Inc. 408, Tashirodaikan-machi Tosu-shi, Saga 841-0017 / JP | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Makoto Tsukuba Laboratory of HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | 02 /
AMANO, Satoshi Tsukuba Laboratory of HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | 03 /
TATEISHI, Tetsuro c/o HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 408, Tashirodaikan-machi Tosu-shi Saga 841-0017 / JP | 04 /
TAKEUCHI, Akio Tsukuba Laboratory of HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | [2016/35] |
Former [2009/29] | 01 /
SUZUKI, Makoto Tsukuba Laboratory of HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | ||
02 /
AMANO, Satoshi Tsukuba Laboratory of HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | |||
03 /
TATEISHI, Tetsuro c/o HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 408, Tashirodaikan-machi Tosu-shi Saga 841-0017 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKEUCHI, Akio Tsukuba Laboratory of HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., INC. 25-11, Kannondai 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0856 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/35] |
Former [2009/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830104.1 | 18.10.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007JP70370 | Priority number, date | JP20060293070 | 27.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006293070 | [2009/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008050673 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078524 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078524 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/343, A61K9/70, A61K47/10, A61K47/14, A61P25/24 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61P25/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2009/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBENDES HAUTPFLASTER | [2009/29] | English: | ADHESIVE SKIN PATCH | [2009/29] | French: | TIMBRE TRANSDERMIQUE ADHÉSIF | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2009 | Translation filed | 23.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 09.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2007 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | IS | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | IE | 18.10.2016 | LU | 18.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | FR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | GB | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.10.2007 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.10.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.10.2007 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.10.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 18.10.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
LU | 18.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
FR | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO2005079756 (NEUROMOLECULAR INC [US], et al) | Examination | US6203817 | US2002192302 | by applicant | JPH0236177 | US6203817 | US2002192302 |