EP2055778 - MUTANT PLANT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riken 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Riken 2-1 Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMINAGA, Rumi RIKEN Yokohama Institute 7-22, Suehiro-cho 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0045 / JP | 02 /
WADA, Takuji RIKEN Yokohama Institute 7-22, Suehiro-cho 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0045 / JP | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07830130.6 | 12.10.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007JP70396 | Priority number, date | JP20060278988 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006278988 | [2009/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008044800 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055778 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/29, A01H1/00, A01H5/00, C07K14/415 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
C12N15/8261 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUTANTENPFLANZE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/19] | English: | MUTANT PLANT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2009/19] | French: | PLANTE MUTANTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2009 | Translation filed | 05.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/28] | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Anonymous, "Riken Plant Science Center - 2006 annual report", (2006), pages 1 - 72, RIKEN YOKOHAMA INSTITUTE, URL: http://www.psc.riken.jp/outline/annual/pdf/report2006.pdf, (20100311), XP002572759 [I] 1-12 * page 33 * | International search | [X]US2004006797 (SHI LIFANG [US], et al); | [X]WO2005047516 (MENDEL BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al); | [X]US2004045049 (ZHANG JAMES [US], et al); | [X]WO2004076638 (MENDEL BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al); | [X]US2004019927 (SHERMAN BRADLEY K [US], et al); | [X]US2003229915 (KEDDIE JAMES [US], et al); | [X] - IWATA M. ET AL., "Shiroinunazuna no Hyohi Saibo Bunka ni Kan'yo suru MYB Idenshi no Kaiseki", DAI 45 KAI THE JAPANESE SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS NENKAI YOSHISHU, (20040320), page 211 + ABSTR. NO. EAE06(437), XP003022202 | [X] - KIRIK V. ET AL., "THE ENHANCER OF TRY AND CPC1 gene acts redundantly with TRIPTYCHON and CAPRICE in trichome and root hair cell patterning in Arabidopsis", DEV. BIOL., (2004), vol. 268, pages 506 - 513, XP003022203 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ydbio.2003.12.037 | [X] - SIMON M. AND SCHIEFELBEIN J., "Role of the CAPRICE family of myb genes in root epidermal development", TAIR, Database accession no. (501716944), XP003022205 | [A] - KIRIK V. ET AL., "ENHANCER of TRY and CPC2 (ETC2) revealas redundancy in the region-specific control of trichome development in Arabidopsis", PLANT. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 55, pages 389 - 398, XP019262502 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11103-004-0893-8 | [XP] - TOMINAGA R. ET AL., "Shiroinunazuna no Hyohi Saibo Bunka ni Kan'yo suru CPC LIKE MYB Idenshi no Kaiseki", DAI 48 KAI THE JAPANESE SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS NENKAI YOSHISHU, (20070315), page 157 + ABSTR. NO. 2AB08(263), XP003022204 | [XP] - TOMINAGA R. ET AL., "The CAPRICE-like Myb3 (CPL3) is involved in the determination of epidermal cell fate in Arabidopsis", TAIR, Database accession no. (501722033), XP003022206 | by applicant | JP2006278988 | - WADA, T. ET AL., "Epidermal cell differentiation in Arabidopsis determined by a Myb homolog, CPC", SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, doi:doi:10.1126/science.277.5329.1113, pages 1113 - 1116, XP002939419 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5329.1113 | - WADA, T. ET AL., "Role of a positive regulator of root hair development, CAPRICE, in Arabidopsis root epidermal cell differentiation", DEVELOPMENT, (2002), vol. 129, pages 5409 - 5419 | - KIRIK, V ET AL., "The ENHANCER OF TRY AND CPC1 gene acts redundantly with TRIPTYCHON and CAPRICE in trichome and root hair cell patterning in Arabidopsis", DEV BIOL, (2004), vol. 268, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ydbio.2003.12.037, pages 506 - 513, XP003022203 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ydbio.2003.12.037 | - KIRIK, V. ET AL., "ENHANCER of TRY and CPC 2 (ETC2) reveals redundancy in the region-specific control of trichome development of Arabidopsis", PLANT MOL BIOL, (2004), vol. 55, doi:doi:10.1007/s11103-004-0893-8, pages 389 - 398, XP019262502 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11103-004-0893-8 | - ESCH, J. J. ET AL., "Comparison of TRY and the closely related Atlg01380 gene in controlling Arabidopsis trichome patterning", PLANT J, (2004), vol. 40, pages 860 - 869 | - KURATA, T ET AL., "Cell-to-cell movement of the CAPRICE protein in Arabidopsis root epidermal cell differentiation", DEVELOPMENT, (2005), vol. 132, pages 5387 - 5398 | - JARVIS, P. ET AL., "An Arabidopsis mutant defective in the plastid general protein import apparatus", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 100 - 103 | - KURATA, T. ET AL., "Cell-to-cell movement of the CAPRICE protein in Arabidopsis root epidermal cell differentiation", DEVELOPMENT, (2005), vol. 132, pages 5387 - 5398 | - YOO, S. Y. ET AL., "The 35S promoter used in a selectable marker gene of a plant transformation vector affects the expression of the transgene", PLANTA, (2005), vol. 221, doi:doi:10.1007/s00425-004-1466-4, pages 523 - 530, XP019344286 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00425-004-1466-4 | - KURATA, T. ET AL., "The YORE-YORE gene regulates multiple aspects of epidermal cell differentiation in Arabidopsis", PLANT J, (2003), vol. 36, pages 55 - 66 | - BAGNALL, ANNALS OF BOTANY, (1993), vol. 71, page 75 | - LEE ET AL., GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (2000), vol. 14, pages 2366 - 2376 | - KOORNNEEF ET AL., MOL GEN GENET, (1991), vol. 229, pages 57 - 66 |