EP2080786 - ACRYLIC THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION, ACRYLIC RESIN FILM AND ACRYLIC RESIN COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOKUCHI, Kazuki KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108691 / JP | 02 /
MORIGUCHI, Nobuhiro KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108691 / JP | 03 /
KAMATA, Yohei KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108691 / JP | 04 /
KOMIYA, Yukiatsu KURARAY CO., LTD. 1-3, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008115 / JP | [2014/10] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
TOKUCHI, Kazuki KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108691 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIGUCHI, Nobuhiro KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108691 / JP | |||
03 /
KAMATA, Yohei KURARAY CO., LTD. 2045-1, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 7108691 / JP | |||
04 /
KOMIYA, Yukiatsu KURARAY CO., LTD. 1-3, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008115 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830331.0 | 23.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007JP70597 | Priority number, date | JP20060287745 | 23.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006287745 | JP20070081872 | 27.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007081872 | JP20070090863 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007090863 | [2009/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008050738 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080786 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080786 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/10, B32B27/30, C08J5/18, C08L29/14 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
B32B27/30 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08L29/14 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L33/10, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE ACRYLHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ACRYLHARZFOLIE UND ACRYLHARZVERBUND | [2009/30] | English: | ACRYLIC THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION, ACRYLIC RESIN FILM AND ACRYLIC RESIN COMPOSITE | [2009/30] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ACRYLIQUE THERMOPLASTIQUE, FILM EN RÉSINE ACRYLIQUE ET COMPOSITE A BASE DE RÉSINE ACRYLIQUE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2009 | Translation filed | 30.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 16.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2007 | AT | 05.03.2014 | BE | 05.03.2014 | CY | 05.03.2014 | CZ | 05.03.2014 | DK | 05.03.2014 | EE | 05.03.2014 | ES | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | LT | 05.03.2014 | LV | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | MT | 05.03.2014 | NL | 05.03.2014 | PL | 05.03.2014 | RO | 05.03.2014 | SE | 05.03.2014 | SI | 05.03.2014 | SK | 05.03.2014 | TR | 05.03.2014 | BG | 05.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | IS | 05.07.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | IE | 23.10.2014 | LU | 23.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.10.2007 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
TR | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 23.10.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 05.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9311206 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-7,12 * example -; claim - * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 6 * [I] 1-7,12; | [XI]US2326543 (MAEHT MAURIEE L) [X] 1-7,12 * example -; claim - * [I] 1-7,12; | [XI]GB721340 (US RUBBER CO) [X] 1-7,12 * example -; claim - * * page 1, line 64 - page 1, line 80 * [I] 1-7,12 | International search | [X]JPH01318059 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JP2006508232 ; | [X]JPH08197855 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH06128022 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) | by applicant | JPS5627378B | JPS5527576B | JP3287255B | JP3287315B | JP2003253016 | JP2003040653 | US3793402 | - JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE PART B, POLYMER PHYSICS, (1987), vol. 25, page 1459 | - MACROMOLECULES, (2001), vol. 34, page 4277 | - J. IND. ENG. CHEM., (2002), vol. 8, no. 6, page 530 |