EP1967504 - SLURRY COMPOSITION FOR CERAMIC GREEN SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND MULTILAYER CERAMIC ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHIDA, Kazuo c/o (A170) Intellectual Property Department Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome, Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2012/18] |
Former [2008/37] | 01 /
KISHIDA, Kazuo c/o (A170) Intellectual Property Department, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome, Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830365.8 | 23.10.2007 | [2008/37] | WO2007JP70631 | Priority number, date | JP20060288503 | 24.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006288503 | [2008/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008050757 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967504 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1967504 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/622, C04B35/632, H01G4/12, H01G4/30, H05K3/46 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
H01G4/1227 (EP,US);
B32B18/00 (EP,US);
C03C14/004 (EP,US);
C04B35/6264 (EP,US);
C04B35/632 (EP,US);
C04B35/6342 (EP,US);
C04B35/63424 (EP,US);
C03C2214/04 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/365 (EP,US);
C04B2235/963 (EP,US);
C04B2237/562 (EP,US);
H01G4/30 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K3/4611 (EP,US);
H05K3/4629 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | SCHLICKERZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EINE KERAMIK-GRÜNFOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE MEHRSCHICHTIGES KERAMIK-ELEKTRONIK-BAUTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2011/31] | English: | SLURRY COMPOSITION FOR CERAMIC GREEN SHEET AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND MULTILAYER CERAMIC ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2008/37] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BARBOTINE POUR FEUILLE DE CÉRAMIQUE CRUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE CÉRAMIQUE MULTICOUCHES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2011/31] |
Former [2008/37] | SCHLAMMZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR EIN KERAMIK-GREEN-SHEET UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE MEHRSCHICHTIGES KERAMIK-ELEKTRONIK-BAUTEIL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2008/37] | COMPOSITION DE BOUILLIE POUR FEUILLE DE CÉRAMIQUE CRUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE CÉRAMIQUE MULTICOUCHES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2008 | Translation filed | 16.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 02.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2007 | AT | 02.05.2012 | BE | 02.05.2012 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | MT | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | GB | 23.10.2012 | IE | 23.10.2012 | LU | 23.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | FR | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 23.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
LU | 23.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 23.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 23.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 23.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
GB | 23.10.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 23.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4536535 (USALA HUGO R [US]) [A] 1-8* column 1, line 67 - line 25; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0479219 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 5,6,8 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5766528 (SU WEI-FANG [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * example 1; tables 1-3 *; | [A]WO03029166 (HERAEUS INC [US]) [A] 5,6,8 * example Tape 1; table 3 * | International search | [A]JPH0696993 (TAIYO YUDEN KK); | [A]JPH07187809 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [A]JP2004319527 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JP2005139034 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [A]JP2006225228 (KYOCERA CORP) |