EP2078707 - SEMICONDUCTOR CERAMIC COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8614 / JP | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Takeshi c/o Advanced Elec. Res. Lab., Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 5200 Mikajiri Kumagaya-shi, Saitama 360-0843 / JP | 02 /
TOJI, Kazuya c/o Yamazaki Works, Hitachi Metals, Ltd, 15-17 Egawa 2-chome, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0013 / JP | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830692.5 | 26.10.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007JP70958 | Priority number, date | JP20060298304 | 01.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006298304 | [2009/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008053813 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078707 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/46, H01C7/02 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
C04B35/46 (KR);
C04B35/4682 (EP,US);
C04B35/62675 (EP,US);
C04B35/62685 (EP,US);
H01C17/06533 (EP,US);
H01C7/02 (KR);
H01C7/025 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3234 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3251 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3294 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3298 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERKERAMIKZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/29] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR CERAMIC COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2009/29] | French: | COMPOSITION CÉRAMIQUE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELLE-CI | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2009 | Translation filed | 27.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 17.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 23.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2006118274 (NEOMAX CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-9 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] *; | [E]EP1876157 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-9 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] *; | [XP]WO2007097462 (NEOMAX CO LTD [JP], et al) [XP] 1-9 * paragraphs [0014] , [0020] , [0026] - paragraph [0036] *; | [E]EP2014626 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-9 * paragraphs [0014] , [0020] , [0026] - paragraph [0036] *; | [Y]WO2006106910 (NEOMAX CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6 * paragraph [0020] *; | EP1873130 [ ] (NEOMAX CO LTD [JP]) | [XYI] - HUO W ET AL, "Effects of Bi1/2Na1/2TiO3 on the Curie temperature and the PTC effects of BaTiO3-based positive temperature coefficient ceramics", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 128, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.SNA.2006.01.022, ISSN 0924-4247, (20060419), pages 265 - 269, (20060419), XP025081734 [X] 1-3 * page 266, paragraph 2.1 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 4,7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2006.01.022 | International search | [Y]WO2006106910 (NEOMAX CO LTD [JP], et al) | [X] - WEIRONG HUO ET AL., "Effects of Bi1/2Na1/2TiO3 on the Curie temperature and the PTC effects of BaTiO3-based positive temperature coefficient ceramics", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, (20060220), vol. 128, no. 2, pages 265 - 269, XP005367212 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sna.2006.01.022 | by applicant | JPS56169301 |